Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8895192 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2014 | B2 | US2011305957 | 15.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008325156 | 22.12.2008 | WO2009JP07068 | 21.12.2009 | JP2009222402 | 28.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPWO2010073588 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2012 | A1 | JP4900627B | 21.03.2012 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP2010543837 | 21.12.2009 | JP2008325156 | 22.12.2008 | WO2009JP07068 | 21.12.2009 | JP2009222402 | 28.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5387666B | Global Dossier | 15.01.2014 | B2 | JP2012079706 | 19.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008325156 | 22.12.2008 | JP2011274500 | 15.12.2011 | JP2009222402 | 28.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2362469 | Global Dossier | 31.05.2017 | B1 | EP2362469 | 18.09.2013 | A4 | EP2362469 | 31.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008325156 | 22.12.2008 | WO2009JP07068 | 21.12.2009 | JP2009222402 | 28.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102144325B | 19.12.2012 | B | CN102144325 | 03.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008325156 | 22.12.2008 | WO2009JP07068 | 21.12.2009 | JP2009222402 | 28.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010073588 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2008325156 | 22.12.2008 | JP2009222402 | 28.09.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101634827B | Global Dossier | 29.06.2016 | B1 | KR20110100186 | 09.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2008325156 | 22.12.2008 | JP2009222402 | 28.09.2009 |