EP2371301 - CLAMPING MEMBER, CLAMP, AND ANASTOMOTIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senko Medical Instrument Mfg. Co., Ltd. 23-13 Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHITSUKI, Mitsuru c/o SENKO MEDICAL INSTRUMENT Mfg. Co. Ltd. 23-13 Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 02 /
OCHIAI, Yuji c/o SENKO MEDICAL INSTRUMENT Mfg. Co. Ltd. 23-13 Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 03 /
SHIBA, Mikio c/o SHIFT. Co. Ltd. 30-11 Sendagaya 5-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0051 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Suekichi c/o SENKO MEDICAL INSTRUMENT Mfg. Co. Ltd. 23-13 Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | 05 /
AKOPOV, Ernest Mikhajlovich Isakovskogo street House 33-4, Flat 97, Floor 10 Moscow 123181 / RU | 06 /
SHIRAKAWA, Makoto c/o SENKO MEDICAL INSTRUMENT Mfg. Co. Ltd. 23-13 Hongo 3-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-0033 / JP | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2011/40] | Khan, Mohammed Saiful Azam Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09834540.8 | 25.12.2009 | WO2009JP07321 | Priority number, date | JP20080329866 | 25.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008329866 | JP20080329867 | 25.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008329867 | [2011/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010073734 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2371301 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/11 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
A61B17/1152 (EP,US);
A61B17/07207 (EP,US);
A61B2017/07214 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1121 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KLEMMELEMENT, KLEMME UND ANASTOMOSEGERÄT | [2011/40] | English: | CLAMPING MEMBER, CLAMP, AND ANASTOMOTIC APPARATUS | [2011/40] | French: | ELÉMENT DE CLAMPAGE, CLAMP ET APPAREIL ANASTOMOTIQUE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2011 | Translation filed | 17.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS534758B (VSESOJUZNYJ NAUCNO- ISSLEDOVATEL'SKIJ I ISPYTATEL'NYJ INSTITUT MEDICIN); | [A]JPS5316634B (VSESOJUZNYJ NAU?NO- ISSLEDOVATEL'SKIJ I ISPYTATEL'NYJ INSTITUT MEDICIN); | [A]JPS581939B (VSESOJUZNYJ NAU?NO- ISSLEDOVATEL'SKIJ I ISPYTATEL'NYJ INSTITUT MEDICIN) | by applicant | JPS5538154 | JPH02111352 |