EP2380955 - CLEANSER COMPOSITION, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME, AMPHIPHILIC COMPOUND, AND COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lion Corporation 3-7, Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | [2011/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONTA, Hiroshi c/o LION CORPORATION 3-7 Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Masako c/o LION CORPORATION 3-7 Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | 03 /
OBAYASHI, Yuko c/o LION CORPORATION 3-7 Honjo 1-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-8644 / JP | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Hill, Christopher Michael Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Hill, Christopher Michael Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 09834659.6 | 18.11.2009 | WO2009JP69554 | Priority number, date | JP20080326217 | 22.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008326217 | JP20080332748 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008332748 | [2011/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010073855 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2380955 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/28, A61K8/46, A61Q5/02, A61Q19/10, C07C309/17, C11D11/04, C07B61/00 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
C07C309/17 (EP);
A61K8/466 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP);
A61Q5/02 (EP);
C11D1/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGERZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, AMPHIPHILE VERBINDUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2011/43] | English: | CLEANSER COMPOSITION, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME, AMPHIPHILIC COMPOUND, AND COMPOSITION | [2011/43] | French: | COMPOSITION DE NETTOYANT, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, COMPOSÉ AMPHIPHILE ET COMPOSITION | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2011 | Translation filed | 21.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 19.02.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5415911 (UNION GEN SABONRII); | [Y]JPH11508873 (AKZO NOBEL N.V.); | [Y]JPH07310092 (KAO CORP); | [Y]JPH06293722 (KAO CORP); | [X] - SMITH, F. D. ET AL., "Soap-based detergent formulations. IX. a-Sulfo fatty alkanolamides as lime soap dispersing agents", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (1974), vol. 51, no. 10, pages 435 - 8, XP001390744 | [X] - WEIL, J. K. ET AL., "Amides of a-sulfonated palmitic and stearic acids", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN OIL CHEMISTS' SOCIETY, (1960), vol. 37, pages 295 - 7, XP008153667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02631770 | [A] - HACKETT, WALTER J. ET AL., "Evaluation of a new tall-oil-derived fatty acid in floor-polish use", Chem. Specialties Mfrs. Assoc., Proc., 46th Ann. Meeting, (195912), pages 239 - 43, XP008160583 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS | [ ] - TOKYO, JAPAN ASSOCIATION, Database accession no. 1960 83703 | by applicant | JPH06330084 | - J. AM. OIL CHEM. SOC., (1960), vol. 37, pages 295 - 297 | - J. AM. OIL CHEM. SOC., (1962), vol. 39, pages 490 - 496 | - J. AM. OIL CHEM. SOC, (1974), vol. 51, pages 435 - 438 |