EP2375111 - SLIDING COMPONENT AND MECHANICAL SEAL, FAUCET VALVE, AND ROLLING SUPPORT DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyocera Corporation 6, Takedatobadono-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8501 / JP | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YASHIMA, Mieko c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Kagoshima Kokubu Plant 1-1 Kokubuyamashita-cho Kirishima-shi Kagoshima 899-4396 / JP | 02 /
ISHIMINE, Yusaku c/o KYOCERA CORPORATION Kagoshima Kokubu Plant 1-1 Kokubuyamashita-cho Kirishima-shi Kagoshima 899-4396 / JP | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/43] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09834677.8 | 27.11.2009 | [2015/43] | WO2009JP70016 | Priority number, date | JP20080329126 | 25.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008329126 | [2011/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010073873 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2375111 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2375111 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
F16J15/3496 (EP,US);
C04B35/565 (EP,US);
C04B35/62695 (EP,US);
C04B35/80 (EP,US);
F16C33/416 (EP,US);
F16C33/62 (EP,US);
F16J15/3404 (EP,US);
F16K25/005 (EP,US);
F16K41/00 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3821 (EP,US);
C04B2235/424 (EP,US);
C04B2235/425 (EP,US);
C04B2235/522 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/524 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5248 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5276 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLEITKOMPONENTE UND MECHANISCHE DICHTUNG, ABSPERRHAHN UND ROLLENAUFLAGE DAMIT | [2011/41] | English: | SLIDING COMPONENT AND MECHANICAL SEAL, FAUCET VALVE, AND ROLLING SUPPORT DEVICE EQUIPPED WITH SAME | [2011/41] | French: | COMPOSANT COULISSANT ET JOINT D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ MÉCANIQUE, SOUPAPE DE ROBINET ET DISPOSITIF DE SUPPORT ROULANT ÉQUIPÉ DESDITS | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2011 | Translation filed | 07.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 26.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.11.2009 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MK | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | SM | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | IE | 27.11.2015 | LU | 27.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | FR | 21.12.2015 | GB | 21.01.2016 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 27.11.2009 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.11.2015 | ||
LU | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 27.11.2009 | |
AT | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BG | 21.10.2015 | ||
CY | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
MT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
TR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
FR | 21.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 27.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
SM | 21.10.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ID]EP1630463 (EAGLE IND CO LTD [JP]) [ID] 1-10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 29] - [0031] - [0 51]; figure 1; claims 1-5; tables 1,3 * | International search | [Y]JP2006057725 (EAGLE IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH05148058 (SERAMIKU E KONPOJITO); | [Y]JP2005523225 (JOHN CRANE INC.); | [Y]JP2007119338 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) | by applicant | JP2006057725 |