EP2383360 - STEEL PLATE EXCELLENT IN RESISTANCE OF DUCTILE CRACK INITIATION FROM WELDED HEAT-AFFECTED ZONE AND BASE MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | STEEL WITH EXCELLENT ANTI-DUCTILE CRACK GENERATION CHARACTERISTICS IN WELD HEAT-AFFECTED ZONE AND BASE MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | ||
[2019/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-0011 / JP | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SADASUE, Teruki c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
IGI, Satoshi c/o Intellectual Property Dept. JFE STEEL CORPORATION 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/27] |
Former [2011/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09835126.5 | 25.12.2009 | [2019/27] | WO2009JP71908 | Priority number, date | JP20080333204 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333204 | JP20080333205 | 26.12.2008 Original published format: JP 2008333205 | [2011/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010074347 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383360 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2383360 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C22C38/60, C21D1/25, C21D9/50, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/08, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/16, C22C38/18, C22C38/14 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,KR,US);
C21D1/25 (EP,KR,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/001 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/002 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/005 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR,US);
C22C38/08 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP,US);
C22C38/14 (EP,US);
C22C38/16 (EP,US);
C22C38/18 (EP,US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,KR,US);
C21D2211/005 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | C22C38/00, C21D8/02, C22C38/60 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STAHLPLATTE MIT HERVORRAGENDEM WIDERSTAND GEGEN DUKTILE RISSBILDUNG IN DER SCHWEISS-WÄRMEEINFLUSSZONE UND AUSGANGSMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2019/11] | English: | STEEL PLATE EXCELLENT IN RESISTANCE OF DUCTILE CRACK INITIATION FROM WELDED HEAT-AFFECTED ZONE AND BASE MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | [2019/11] | French: | PLAQUE D'ACIER PRESENTANT D'EXCELLENTE RESISTANCE CONTRE LA FORMATION DE FISSURES DUCTILES DANS UNE ZONE AFFECTEE PAR LA CHALEUR DE SOUDURE, MATERIAU DE BASE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIES | [2019/12] |
Former [2011/44] | STAHL MIT HERVORRAGENDEN ANTIDUKTILRISSBILDUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN IN VON SCHWEISSHITZE BETROFFENER ZONE UND BASISMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2011/44] | STEEL WITH EXCELLENT ANTI-DUCTILE CRACK GENERATION CHARACTERISTICS IN WELD HEAT-AFFECTED ZONE AND BASE MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR | ||
Former [2011/44] | ACIER PRESENTANT D'EXCELLENTES CARACTERISTIQUES ANTI-FORMATION DE RUPTURES DUCTILES DANS UNE ZONE AFFECTEE PAR LA CHALEUR DE SOUDURE, MATERIAU DE BASE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ASSOCIES | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2011 | Translation filed | 25.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 27.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.12.2009 | AT | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | ES | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | IT | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | PL | 03.07.2019 | RO | 03.07.2019 | SE | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | NO | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | IE | 25.12.2019 | LU | 25.12.2019 | BE | 31.12.2019 | CH | 31.12.2019 | LI | 31.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 25.12.2009 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 25.12.2009 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.12.2019 | ||
BE | 31.12.2019 | ||
CH | 31.12.2019 | ||
LI | 31.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IE | 25.12.2019 | ||
LU | 25.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002043305 (FAIRCHILD DOUGLAS P [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0110] *; | [A]EP1431407 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5 * examples G-1; tables 1-4 * * example C; tables 7-8 * * example B; tables 9-10 * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US2004187982 (NAKATA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XD]JP2008202119 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [XD] 1-5 * examples 1-5, 8,9,14,16,18, 20-28, 30,x1, x3, x4, x6, x7; tables 1-5 * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0127] *; | [X]JP2008208406 (JFE STEEL KK) [X] 1 * examples 3, 9; table 1 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0064] * | International search | [A]JPH1192858 (NIPPON KOKAN KK); | [A]JP2006274372 (JFE STEEL KK); | [A]JP2007197777 (JFE STEEL KK); | [A]JP2008202119 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) | by applicant | JP2000328177 | JP2003221619 | JP2008202119 |