EP2376020 - VAGINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invent Medic Sweden AB Scheelevägen 2 223 81 Lund / SE | [2016/46] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Invent Medic Sweden AB Mandelblomsvägen 7 281 37 Hässleholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henriksson, Lars Baldersgången 27 S-235 35 Vellinge / SE | 02 /
Clarén, Jan Hjortgatan 10 S-223 50 Lund / SE | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [2017/04] |
Former [2011/42] | Jakobsson, Jeanette Helene Awapatent AB Bellevuevägen 46 P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 09835346.9 | 17.12.2009 | [2017/04] | WO2009SE51438 | Priority number, date | SE20080050172 | 22.12.2008 Original published format: SE 0850172 | US20080139742P | 22.12.2008 Original published format: US 139742 P | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010074635 | Date: | 01.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376020 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2376020 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/00 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
A61F2/005 (EP,SE,US);
A61B5/205 (US);
A61H21/00 (US);
A61N1/0524 (US);
A61N1/36007 (US);
A61B2017/00805 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VAGINALE VORRICHTUNG | [2011/42] | English: | VAGINAL DEVICE | [2011/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF VAGINAL | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2017 | CY | 25.01.2017 | CZ | 25.01.2017 | MC | 25.01.2017 | MK | 25.01.2017 | RO | 25.01.2017 | SK | 25.01.2017 | SM | 25.01.2017 | TR | 25.01.2017 | BG | 25.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
MK | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CY | 25.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
MC | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
SM | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
RO | 25.01.2017 | ||
SK | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
CZ | 25.01.2017 | ||
BG | 25.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 25.01.2017 | |
BG | 25.04.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]GB2090144 (THAMES VALLEY MEDICAL LTD, et al); | [XA]GB2146901 (EAKIN THOMAS GEORGE); | [XI]WO9849980 (COLOPLAST AS [DK], et al) | International search | [A]FR2228464 (HEGUY MICHELLE [FR]); | [A]US4873996 (MAURER DONALD D [US]); | [A]US5609559 (WEITZNER HOWARD B [US]); | [A]US6135945 (SULTAN HASHEM [US]); | [A]US6645137 (ULMSTEN ULF [SE], et al); | [A]US6739340 (JENSEN HANNE [DK], et al) |