Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011257281 | Global Dossier | 20.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14013108 | 23.12.2008 | US200913141451 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009US69099 | 22.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101679441B | Global Dossier | 24.11.2016 | B1 | KR20110110220 | 06.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US14013108 | 23.12.2008 | WO2009US69099 | 22.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5791517B | Global Dossier | 07.10.2015 | B2 | JP2012513498 | 14.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US14013108 | 23.12.2008 | WO2009US69099 | 22.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2376561 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | B1 | EP2376561 | 02.05.2012 | A4 | EP2376561 | 19.10.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14013108 | 23.12.2008 | WO2009US69099 | 22.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0918191 | 01.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14013108 | 23.12.2008 | WO2009US69099 | 22.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102307935B | 09.06.2017 | B | CN102307935 | 04.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US14013108 | 23.12.2008 | WO2009US69099 | 22.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010075328 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2010 | A3 | WO2010075328 | 01.07.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14013108 | 23.12.2008 |