EP2384588 - PHYSICAL STRUCTURE AND SEQUENCE DESIGN OF MIDAMBLE IN OFDMA SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MediaTek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-chu City, Taiwan 300 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | For all designated states Mediatek Inc. No. 1, Dusing Road 1 Science-based Industrial Park Hsin-chu City, Taiwan 300 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, Chih-Yuan No.1, Lane 51, Sec. 3 Jhongsing Rd. Wujie Township Yilan County Taiwan 268 / CN | 02 /
LIAO, Pei-Kai No.2 Wushuang Lane 9 Neighborhood Wandan Village Mingjian Shiang Nantou County Taiwan 551 / CN | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 09836083.7 | 31.12.2009 | WO2009CN76316 | Priority number, date | US20080141814P | 31.12.2008 Original published format: US 141814 P | US20090219452P | 23.06.2009 Original published format: US 219452 P | US20090655524 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: US 655524 | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010075796 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384588 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L27/26 | [2013/05] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP,US);
H04J11/005 (US);
H04L27/261 (EP,US);
H04L5/005 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03796 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/45] | H04W4/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PHYSIKALISCHE STRUKTUR UND SEQUENZENTWURF FÜR MIDAMBLES IN OFDMA-SYSTEMEN | [2011/45] | English: | PHYSICAL STRUCTURE AND SEQUENCE DESIGN OF MIDAMBLE IN OFDMA SYSTEMS | [2011/45] | French: | CONCEPTION DE STRUCTURE PHYSIQUE ET DE SÉQUENCE DE MIDAMBULE DANS DES SYSTÈMES OFDMA | [2011/45] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 17.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006094435 (THOMAS TIMOTHY A [US], et al) [A] 1-8* figure 3 *; | [A]WO2007053954 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0010] , [0354] , [0382] * * figures 13a,13b,27 *; | [A]WO2008120925 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 49] - [0050] - [0 90] * * figures 4, 11-16 *; | [I] - BISHWARUP MONDAL ET AL, "IEEE 802.16m Sounding Channel Design Proposal", INTERNET CITATION, (20080714), URL: http://www.ieee802.org/16/tgm/contrib/C80216m-08_835.pdf, (20121212), XP002689054 [I] 1-8 * pages 3, 5, 7 * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Uplink reference signals", no. R1-063128, (20061106), pages 1 - 5, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #47BIS,, URL: www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_47/Docs/R1-063128.zip, (20080902), XP002494361 [A] 1-8 * sections I-II * | [A] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Closed Loop Antenna Switching in E-UTRA uplink", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 MEETING #48 ST.LOUIS, US,, (20070212), vol. R1-070860, no. 48, pages 1 - 3, XP002487230 [A] 1-8 * Sections I-III * | [A] - Y. LOMNITZ, H. NIU, JK. FWU, S. AHMADI, H. YIN, INTEL CORP., "Proposal for IEEE 802.16m Downlink Symbol Structure Concept ; S80216m-08_120r1", IEEE DRAFT; S80216M-08_120R1, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, (20080312), vol. 802.16m, pages 1 - 67, XP017616366 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - S. MOON, JS. KWAK, W. LEE, Y. YUK, "Frame structure for ieee 802.16m", IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080116), XP040391667 [A] 1-8 * figure 3 * | International search | [A]US2003026223 (ERIKSSON MATHIAS [SE], et al); | [Y]CN1703852 (ARRAYCOMM INC [US]); | [Y]CN1870465 (DUKEMO BEIJIN COMM TECHNOLOGY [CN]); | [Y]CN101162987 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [XP]WO2009125946 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) | by applicant | US20140611418 | US19520612194 |