EP2368201 - WORD SENSE DISAMBIGUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Houston System 316 Cullen Building Houston, Texas 77204-2015 / US | [2011/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Ping 4218 Pine Blossom Houston Texas 77059 / US | 02 /
DING, Wei 401 Mount Vernon Street, No. 826 Dorchester Massachusetts 02125 / US | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/39] | 01 /
CHEN, Ping 4218 Pine Blossom Houston Texas 77059 / US | ||
02 /
DING, Wei 401 Mount Vernon Street Dorchester Massachusetts 02125 / US | Representative(s) | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09836749.3 | 09.12.2009 | WO2009US67261 | Priority number, date | US20080121015P | 09.12.2008 Original published format: US 121015 P | [2011/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010077714 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2368201 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
G06F40/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/39] | G06F17/30, G06F17/27, G06F17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON WORTBEDEUTUNGEN | [2011/39] | English: | WORD SENSE DISAMBIGUATION | [2011/39] | French: | DÉSAMBIGUÏSATION DE SENS D'UN MOT | [2011/39] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/39] | 27.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/49] | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 23.05.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PING CHEN ET AL, "Parsing tree matching based question answering", TEXT ANALYSIS CONFERENCE (TAC), Gaithersburg, Maryland, USA, (20081117), XP055068904 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * Sections 1-2;; figures 1-3 * | [X] - DEKANG LIN, "Using syntactic dependency as local context to resolve word sense ambiguity", PROCEEDING ACL '98 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 35TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS AND EIGHTH CONFERENCE OF THE EUROPEAN CHAPTER OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS, Montreal, Québec, Canada, (19980810), pages 64 - 71, XP055068903 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * Sections 1-3 * | [X] - XIAOBIN LI ET AL, "A WordNet-based algorithm for word sense disambiguation", PROCEEDING IJCAI'95 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 14TH INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, Montreal, Québec, Canada, (19950820), vol. 2, pages 1368 - 1374, XP055068881 [X] 1,5 * abstract * * Sections 1-4 * | [A] - SATANJEEV BANERJEE ET AL, "Extended gloss overlaps as a measure of semantic relatedness", IJCAI-03: PROCEEDINGS OF THE EIGHTEENTH INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, Acapulco, Mexico, (20030809), XP055068547 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Sections 1-3, 5 * | [A] - ROBERTO NAVIGLI ET AL, "Graph Connectivity Measures for Unsupervised Word Sense Disambiguation", PROCEEDING IJCAI'07 PROCEEDINGS OF THE 20TH INTERNATIONAL JOINT CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE, Hyderabad, India, (20070106), pages 1683 - 1688, XP055068697 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Sections 1-3 * | [A] - LESK M, "Automatic Sense Disambiguation Using Machine Readable Dictionaries: How to Tell a Pine Cone from an Ice Cream Cone", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMSDOCUMENTATION, XX, XX, (19860101), pages 24 - 26, XP002224563 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - KILGARRIFF A ET AL, "Introduction to the special issue on the Web as corpus", COMPUTATIONAL LINGUISTICS, CAMBRIDGE, MA, US, (20030901), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 333 - 347, XP008080788 [A] 13 * the whole document * | [XP] - PING CHEN ET AL, "A Fully UnsupervisedWord Sense Disambiguation Method Using Dependency Knowledge", HUMAN LANGUAGE TECHNOLOGIES: THE 2009 ANNUAL CONFERENCE OF THE NORTH AMERICAN CHAPTER OF THE ACL, PAGES 28-36, BOULDER, COLORADO, USA, Stroudsberg. PA, USA, (20090531), pages 28 - 36, XP055068930 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO9641333 (DRAGON SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [A]WO2005020091 (IDILIA INC [CA]); | [A]JP2005128961 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) | by applicant | - XIAOBIN LI ET AL., A WORDNET-BASED ALGORITHM FOR WORD SENSE DISAMBIGUATION |