11.11.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
31.07.2016 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
04.02.2016 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.12.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
06.05.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.11.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.08.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.05.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
22.04.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
19.04.2013 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.12.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.05.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
11.05.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
11.05.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
02.03.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] |
25.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.09.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
02.09.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
19.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|