Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8153853 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2012 | B2 | US2011201862 | 18.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | US201113095594 | 27.04.2011 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5653363B | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | B2 | JP2012513999 | 21.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | WO2009US68900 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2370382 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2012 | A4 | EP2370382 | 05.10.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | WO2009US68900 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0923773 | 21.07.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | WO2009US68900 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102272076 | 07.12.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | WO2009US68900 | 21.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010078098 | Global Dossier | 08.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7956157 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2011 | B2 | US2010168347 | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110111387 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015078197 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI408125B | 11.09.2013 | B | TW201035045 | 01.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US34792208 | 31.12.2008 |