EP2370382 - PROCESSES USING DIVIDING WALL DISTILLATION COLUMN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fina Technology, Inc. P.O. Box 674412 Houston, TX 77267-4412 / US | [2011/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTLER, James, R. 422 Jessamine Way League City TX 77573 / US | [2011/40] | Representative(s) | Raboin, Jean-Christophe, et al Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Leyder, Francis Total Reseach & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Neel, Henry Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Patent Department Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 09836984.6 | 21.12.2009 | WO2009US68900 | Priority number, date | US20080347922 | 31.12.2008 Original published format: US 347922 | [2011/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010078098 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2370382 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08F112/08, C08F2/01, C07C7/04, C07C15/46, C07C15/073, // C07C15/04, C07C15/06 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
C07C7/04 (EP,KR,US);
B01D3/141 (EP,US);
C07C15/073 (KR);
C07C15/46 (KR);
C08F112/08 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,US);
Y10S585/921 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C7/04, C07C15/04 (EP,US);
C07C7/04, C07C15/06 (US,EP);
C07C7/04, C07C15/073 (US,EP);
C07C7/04, C07C15/46 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2011/40] | C07C15/04, C07C15/06, C07C15/08, C07C15/02, C08F112/08, C08F2/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN MIT TRENNWAND-DESTILLATIONSSÄULEN | [2011/40] | English: | PROCESSES USING DIVIDING WALL DISTILLATION COLUMN | [2011/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉS METTANT EN UVRE UNE COLONNE DE DISTILLATION À SÉPARATION INTERNE | [2011/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 19.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/50] | 01.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.2013 | 31.12.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2008293983 (SCHULTZ MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 14-17 * figure - * [Y] 1-13; | [XY]US2008289946 (SCHULTZ MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 14-17 * figure - * [Y] 1-13; | [A]WO2006136255 (UHDE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * figure - * | International search | [X]US2471134 (WRIGHT RICHARD O); | [X]US2008293985 (SCHULTZ MICHAEL A [US], et al) |