EP2382828 - POWER SAVING IN PEER-TO-PEER COMMUNICATION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2015/48] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONG, Michelle, Xiaohong 899 Lois Ave. Sunnyvale CA 94087 / US | 02 /
STEPHENS, Adrian, P. 64 Lamb's Lane Cottenham Cambridge CB4 8TA / GB | 03 /
JALFON, Marc Hasuka Street 18 Zichron Yaakov 30900 Hafia / IL | 04 /
TAI, Tsung-Yuan, Charles 12709 NW Majestic Sequoia Way Portland OR 97229 / US | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Hufton, David Alan HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [2015/48] |
Former [2011/44] | Hufton, David Alan Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green GB-Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09837051.3 | 23.12.2009 | [2015/48] | WO2009US69490 | Priority number, date | US20080317969 | 31.12.2008 Original published format: US 317969 | [2011/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010078206 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2382828 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382828 | Date: | 25.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W76/02 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H04W52/0216 (EP,BR,US);
H04W52/02 (KR);
H04B7/24 (KR);
H04W92/18 (KR);
H04W76/14 (EP,BR,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEEINSPARUNG BEI GERÄTEN FÜR GLEICHRANGIGE KOMMUNIKATION | [2011/44] | English: | POWER SAVING IN PEER-TO-PEER COMMUNICATION DEVICES | [2011/44] | French: | ÉCONOMIE D'ÉNERGIE DANS DES DISPOSITIFS DE COMMUNICATION D'HOMOLOGUE À HOMOLOGUE | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2009 | AT | 25.11.2015 | BE | 25.11.2015 | BG | 25.11.2015 | CY | 25.11.2015 | CZ | 25.11.2015 | DK | 25.11.2015 | EE | 25.11.2015 | ES | 25.11.2015 | FI | 25.11.2015 | HR | 25.11.2015 | LT | 25.11.2015 | LV | 25.11.2015 | MC | 25.11.2015 | MK | 25.11.2015 | MT | 25.11.2015 | PL | 25.11.2015 | RO | 25.11.2015 | SE | 25.11.2015 | SI | 25.11.2015 | SK | 25.11.2015 | SM | 25.11.2015 | TR | 25.11.2015 | IE | 23.12.2015 | LU | 23.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 25.02.2016 | GR | 26.02.2016 | IS | 25.03.2016 | PT | 25.03.2016 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
LU | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 23.12.2009 | |
AT | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BG | 25.11.2015 | ||
CY | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
MT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
TR | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
BE | 25.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SI | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
IE | 23.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
MC | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
DK | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
SM | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
EE | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
RO | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
SK | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
CZ | 25.11.2015 | ||
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
LV | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 25.11.2015 | |
ES | 25.11.2015 | ||
FI | 25.11.2015 | ||
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
PL | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
GR | 26.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
PT | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
HR | 25.11.2015 | ||
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
SE | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
IS | 25.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | ||
NO | 25.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 25.11.2015 | |
LT | 25.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007226351 (FISCHER MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] * * figures 12, 13 * * paragraphs [0089] - [0120] * [I] 4-6,8,10-15; | [XI]US2008219228 (SEOK YONG HO [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 10] - [0024] * * figures 2, 3, 12, 13 * * paragraphs [0039] - [0101] * [I] 4-6,8,10-15 | International search | [A]US2008219228 (SEOK YONG HO [KR], et al); | [A]US2007281720 (LEE CHUN WOO [US]); | [A]US2006264214 (STANWOOD KENNETH L [US], et al); | [A]US2006165035 (CHANDRA ARTY [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007226351 | US2008219228 |