EP2311705 - CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aisin AW Co., Ltd. 10 Takane Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASE Shigekazu c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
UENO Hiroya c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 03 /
TSUDA Kohei c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 04 /
MORIYAMA Eiji c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | 05 /
TSUTSUI Hiroshi c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | [2013/25] |
Former [2011/16] | 01 /
HASE Shigekazu c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | ||
02 /
UENO Hiroya c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | |||
03 /
TSUDA Kohei c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | |||
04 /
MORIYAMA Eiji c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | |||
05 /
TSUTSUI Hiroshi c/o AISIN AW CO. LTD. 10 Takane Fujiicho Anjo-shi Aichi 444-1192 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2013/25] |
Former [2011/16] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09837599.1 | 25.12.2009 | [2011/16] | WO2009JP71642 | Priority number, date | JP20090002489 | 08.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009002489 | [2011/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010079714 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311705 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2311705 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/48, B60W10/08, B60W20/00, F16H61/06, B60W30/18, B60W10/02, B60W30/19, B60W10/115, B60L11/18 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
B60L58/12 (EP,US);
F16H61/06 (KR);
B60K6/48 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/026 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,KR,US);
B60W10/115 (EP,US);
B60W20/30 (US);
B60W30/18127 (EP,US);
B60W30/19 (EP,US);
F16H59/14 (KR);
F16H61/061 (EP,US);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W2510/083 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1015 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
B60W2710/081 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/16] | B60W10/10, B60K6/48, B60K6/547, B60L11/14, B60W10/08, B60W20/00, F16H61/06, F16H59/14, F16H59/42, F16H59/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERVORRICHTUNG | [2011/16] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE | [2011/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2011 | Translation filed | 08.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 13.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.12.2009 | AT | 19.06.2013 | BE | 19.06.2013 | CY | 19.06.2013 | CZ | 19.06.2013 | DK | 19.06.2013 | EE | 19.06.2013 | FI | 19.06.2013 | HR | 19.06.2013 | IT | 19.06.2013 | LT | 19.06.2013 | LV | 19.06.2013 | MC | 19.06.2013 | MK | 19.06.2013 | MT | 19.06.2013 | NL | 19.06.2013 | PL | 19.06.2013 | RO | 19.06.2013 | SE | 19.06.2013 | SI | 19.06.2013 | SK | 19.06.2013 | SM | 19.06.2013 | TR | 19.06.2013 | BG | 19.09.2013 | NO | 19.09.2013 | GR | 20.09.2013 | ES | 30.09.2013 | IS | 19.10.2013 | PT | 21.10.2013 | IE | 25.12.2013 | LU | 25.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 25.12.2009 | |
AT | 19.06.2013 | ||
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
SM | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
MK | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
SM | 19.06.2013 | ||
TR | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
SM | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
IE | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
MC | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
LU | 25.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
IT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
DK | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
NL | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
PL | 19.06.2013 | ||
RO | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
SK | 19.06.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
IS | 19.10.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 19.06.2013 | |
BE | 19.06.2013 | ||
EE | 19.06.2013 | ||
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 19.06.2013 | |
FI | 19.06.2013 | ||
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
PT | 21.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
LV | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
HR | 19.06.2013 | ||
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
BG | 19.09.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 19.06.2013 | |
LT | 19.06.2013 | ||
SE | 19.06.2013 | ||
SI | 19.06.2013 | ||
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
GR | 20.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | ||
ES | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 19.06.2013 | |
NO | 19.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1916452 (JATCO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2004203219 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JPH06331013 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP); | [Y]JPH1182712 (AISIN AW CO); | [Y]JP2007092812 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2002130453 | JP2008094332 |