EP2386069 - OPTICAL ENGINE FOR POINT-TO-POINT COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2017 [2017/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77707 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIORENTINO, Marco 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto California 94304-1100 / US | 02 /
XU, Qianfan 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto California 94304-1100 / US | 03 /
BEAUSOLEIL, Raymond, G. 1501 Page Mill Rd. MS 1123 Palo Alto California 94304-1123 / US | 04 /
MATHAI, Sagi, Varghese 1501 Page Mill Road Palo Alto California 94304-1100 / US | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | Stöckeler, Ferdinand Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Stöckeler, Ferdinand Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09837742.7 | 09.01.2009 | WO2009US30664 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010080157 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2386069 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, G02B6/43 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
G02B6/43 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/34 (EP,US);
G02B6/4246 (EP,US);
G02B6/4214 (EP,US);
G02B6/4249 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHE MASCHINE FÜR PUNKT-ZU-PUNKT-KOMMUNIKATION | [2011/46] | English: | OPTICAL ENGINE FOR POINT-TO-POINT COMMUNICATIONS | [2011/46] | French: | MOTEUR OPTIQUE POUR COMMUNICATIONS POINT À POINT | [2011/46] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/46] | 03.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/06] | 27.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5070488 (FUKUSHIMA ATSUKO [JP], et al) [I] 1,9,11 * column 7, line 43 - line 68; figure 4 *; | [I]US2001009594 (HOSOI TORU [JP]) [I] 1,2,4,5,9,11-14 * paragraphs [0061] , [0087] - [0091]; figures 6,12 *; | [A]US2006008199 (GLEBOV ALEXEI [US], et al) [A] 1,11,15* paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0050]; figures 1,2,6 *; | [I]US2008001062 (GUNN DEANA [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,9,11,12 * paragraphs [0051] - [0053] - [0093] - [0095]; figures 4,16 * | International search | [Y]US2006210215 (AOKI SHIGENORI [JP], et al); | [Y]US6967347 (ESTES MICHAEL J [US], et al); | [A]US5469518 (SONG SEOK-HO [KR], et al) | [A] - XU, QIANFAN ET AL, "Cascaded silicon micro-ring modulators for WDM optical interconnection", OPTICS EXPRESS, vol. 14, no. 20, (200610), pages 9430 - 9435, URL: http://www.opticsinfobase.org/DirectPDFAccess/D30FE058-BDB9-137E-C49F9EA90BFC8626_114623.pdf?da=1&id=114623&seq=0&CFID=42120127&CFTOKEN=36805084 | [A] - BENTER, NILS ET AL., "Large-area Fabry-Perot modulator based on electro-optic polymers.", APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 44, no. 29, (200510), pages 6235 - 6239, URL: http://www.opticsinfobase.org/ao/abstract.cfm?uri=ao-44-29-6235 | Examination | JPH0431805 | JPH11174271 | JP2008046546 | by applicant | US2001009594 | US2008001062 | US5070488 | US2006008199 |