EP2377092 - ENHANCED VOICEMAIL USAGE THROUGH AUTOMATIC VOICEMAIL PREVIEW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2011/42] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMAKER, Jon One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
HEROLD, Keith One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
WILSON, Michael One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
NOTARIO, David One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
MILLETT, Tom One Microsoft Way Redmond WA 98052-6399 / US | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09837805.2 | 03.12.2009 | WO2009US66623 | Priority number, date | US20090351681 | 09.01.2009 Original published format: US 351681 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010080261 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2377092 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, H04M3/533, H04M3/53, H04M1/27 | [2014/05] | CPC: |
H04M3/53358 (EP,US);
G06Q50/60 (KR);
H04M1/271 (US);
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04M1/64 (KR);
H04M3/533 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | G06Q50/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VOICEMAIL-VERWENDUNG DURCH AUTOMATISCHE VOICEMAIL-VORSCHAU | [2011/42] | English: | ENHANCED VOICEMAIL USAGE THROUGH AUTOMATIC VOICEMAIL PREVIEW | [2011/42] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE MESSAGERIE VOCALE AMÉLIORÉE PAR PRÉVISUALISATION D'UNE MESSAGERIE VOCALE AUTOMATIQUE | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 22.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.10.2018 | 31.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/14] | 31.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/14] | 19.11.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2362745 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 25 - page 5, line 31 ** page 6, line 11 - page 13, line 37 *; | [I]US2005163289 (CASPI RAMI [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0020] - [0078] *; | [XI]US2007153989 (HOWELL DAVID A [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0016] - [0058] * [I] 1-15; | [I]US2008267366 (MUKHOPADHYAY AMIT [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0033] * | International search | [A]US2006223502 (DOULTON DANIEL M [GB]); | [Y]WO2008103507 (ADOMO INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2008103504 (ADOMO INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2008273675 (SIMINOFF JAMES [US]) | Examination | US2003236099 | by applicant | US2007153989 |