EP2383227 - PREPARATION OF MATERIAL CONTAINING AMORPHOUS IRON OXYHYDROXIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | PREPARATION AND REPEATED REGENERATION OF MATERIAL CONTAINING AMORPHOUS IRON OXYHYDROXIDE, DESULFURIZATION AGENTS CONTAINING THE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION AND REPEATED REGENERATION THEREOF | ||
[2017/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Sanju Environmental Protection and New Material Co., Ltd. 9/F Dahang Jiye Building No. 33 North RenDa Road Haidian, Beijing 100080 / CN | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Zhenyi 9/F Dahang Jiye Building No. 33 North RenDa Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 02 /
YU, Yongsheng 9/F Dahang Jiye Building No. 33 North RenDa Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | 03 /
LIN, Ke 9/F Dahang Jiye Building No. 33 North RenDa Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/44] | Rogers, Alex Lee Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09838075.1 | 30.12.2009 | [2018/04] | WO2009CN01596 | Priority number, date | CN20091086346 | 31.05.2009 Original published format: CN200910086346 | CN200810247534 | 30.12.2008 Original published format: CN200810247534 | CN20091086349 | 31.05.2009 Original published format: CN200910086349 | CN200810247536 | 30.12.2008 Original published format: CN200810247536 | [2011/44] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010081288 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383227 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2383227 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/745, B01J23/94, B01J37/00, C01G49/02, C01G49/16, B01D53/48, B01D53/52 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
C01G49/02 (EP,US);
B01D53/508 (EP,US);
B01J20/0229 (EP,US);
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
B01J20/2803 (EP,US);
B01J20/3071 (EP,US);
B01J20/3433 (EP,US);
B01J20/3458 (EP,US);
B01J23/745 (EP,US);
C01P2002/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/44] | C01G49/02, C01G49/16, B01D53/48, B01D53/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON AMORPHES EISENOXIDHYDROXID ENTHALTENDEM MATERIAL | [2017/34] | English: | PREPARATION OF MATERIAL CONTAINING AMORPHOUS IRON OXYHYDROXIDE | [2017/34] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'UN MATÉRIAU CONTENANT DE L'OXYHYDROXYDE DE FER AMORPHE | [2017/34] |
Former [2011/44] | HERSTELLUNG UND WIEDERHOLTE REGENERATION VON AMORPHES EISENOXIDHYDROXID ENTHALTENDEM MATERIAL, ENTSCHWEFELUNGSMITTEL, DIE DAS MATERIAL ENTHALTEN, UND HERSTELLUNG UND WIEDERHOLTE REGENERATION DAVON | ||
Former [2011/44] | PREPARATION AND REPEATED REGENERATION OF MATERIAL CONTAINING AMORPHOUS IRON OXYHYDROXIDE, DESULFURIZATION AGENTS CONTAINING THE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION AND REPEATED REGENERATION THEREOF | ||
Former [2011/44] | PRÉPARATION ET RÉGÉNÉRATION RÉPÉTÉE D'UN MATÉRIAU CONTENANT DE L'OXYHYDROXYDE DE FER AMORPHE, DÉSULFURANT CONTENANT CE MATÉRIAU, ET PRÉPARATION ET RÉGÉNÉRATION RÉPÉTÉE DE CE DERNIER | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2011 | Translation filed | 29.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 05.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 14.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 29.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.12.2009 | AT | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | CZ | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | ES | 24.01.2018 | HR | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | MK | 24.01.2018 | NL | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | SI | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | SM | 24.01.2018 | TR | 24.01.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 30.12.2009 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
ES | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NL | 24.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | LT | 24.01.2018 | |
NL | 24.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH10259026 (SONY CORP) [X] 6 * the whole document * [A] 1-5; | [XI]US2005247636 (SCHLEGEL ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 6,8-11 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0006] , [0023] , [0053] - [0063] - [0068] , [0073] - [0075] * * examples 3-5 * * claim - * [I] 1-5; | [XAI]US2008047395 (LIU ZHENYI [CN], et al) [X] 8-11 * the whole document * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0012] * * example - * * claim - * [A] 6 [I] 1-5; | [XPA]CN101584962 (BEIJING SJ ENVIRONMENTAL PROT & NEW MATERIAL CO LTD [CN]) [XP] 6,8-11 * the whole document * * example - * * claim - * [A] 1-5; | [XPAI]CN101585556 (BEIJING SJ ENVIRONMENTAL PROT & NEW MATERIAL CO LTD [CN]) [XP] 6 * the whole document * * example - * * claim - * [A] 1-5 [I] 8-11; | [XPA]WO2009150232 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [XP] 6,8-11 * page 2, line 12 - page 7, line 8 * * page 9, line 31 - page 7, line 8 * [A] 1-5; | [X] - BENJAMIN M M ET AL, "Multiple-site adsorption of Cd, Cu, Zn, and Pb on amorphous iron oxyhydroxide", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, ACADEMIC PRESS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 79, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0021-9797(81)90063-1, ISSN 0021-9797, (19810101), pages 209 - 221, (19810101), XP025443714 [X] 6 * the whole document * * page 211, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9797(81)90063-1 | International search | [A]JPH10259026 (SONY CORP); | [A]CN101119934 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH AGENCY [JP]); | [X]CN101274781 (TDK CORP [JP]); | [Y]CN101274781 (TDK CORP [JP]); | [Y] - LIU, ZHENYI ET AL., "Characterization of an Active Component of Iron Oxide Desulfurization Agent with High Sulfur Adsorption Capacity.", 2006 NATIONAL GAS PURIFICATION TECHNOLOGY SEMINAR PROCEEDINGS., (2006), pages 107 - 111, XP008150134 | Examination | US2008241055 |