EP2388841 - SURFACE-TREATED SUBSTRATE FOR AN INKJET PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Postech Academy-Industry Foundation San 31 Hyoja-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | For all designated states Postech Academy-industry Foundation San 31 Hyoja-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 790-784 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Kil Won 8-303, Gyosu Apt. Jigok-dong Nam-gu Pohang-si Gyungbuk 790-751 / KR | 02 /
LIM, Jung Ah 101-501, Ace10Cha Apt. Tanhyeon-dong Ilsan-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do 411-320 / KR | [2011/47] | Representative(s) | Beck, Michael Rudolf, et al Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe, et al BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09838445.6 | 19.11.2009 | WO2009KR06802 | Priority number, date | KR20090003479 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: KR 20090003479 | [2011/47] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010082724 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2388841 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 10.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/48, H01L29/78, H01L51/00 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
H10K71/135 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02288 (KR);
H01L29/41725 (KR);
H01L29/4232 (KR);
H10K71/10 (KR);
H10K71/611 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2011/47] | H01L51/48, H01L29/78 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENBEHANDELTES SUBSTRAT FÜR EINEN TINTENSTRAHLDRUCKER | [2011/47] | English: | SURFACE-TREATED SUBSTRATE FOR AN INKJET PRINTER | [2011/47] | French: | SUBSTRAT TRAITÉ EN SURFACE POUR IMPRIMANTE À JET D'ENCRE | [2011/47] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2011 | Translation filed | 04.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/47] | 17.05.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/24] | 08.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.03.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]KR100660383B ; | [X]US2007090362 (AHN TAEK [KR], et al); | [A]KR20080066152 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [X]KR20080078348 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | US2007248746 | by applicant | WO9939373 | JP2003092410 | KR20040028010 | KR20040084427 | KR20080064335 |