EP2389693 - Light emitting diode device and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/48] | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
[2016/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Siltron Inc. 274, Imsu-dong Gumi, Gyeongsanbuk-do 730-350 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2011/48] | For all designated states Siltron Inc. 274 Imsu-dong Gumi-si Gyeongsangbuk-do 730-350 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Ho-Jun 2489-24, Namsan 4-dong Jung-gu Daegu 700-444 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Dong-Kun 106-1104, Okgye e-Pyeonhansesang Apt. Gumi-si, Gyeongbuk 730-748 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yong-Jin 105-910, Buyeong Apt. Gupyeong-dong Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-787 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Doo-Soo 102-703 Iwon Livervill Apt. Waegwan 1-ri Waegwan-eup Chilgok-gun Gyeongbuk 718-805 / KR | [2012/16] |
Former [2011/48] | 01 /
LEE, Ho-Jun 2489-24, Namsan 4-dong Jung-gu Daegu 700-444 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Dong-Kun 203-1206, Buyeong 2 Danji Gupyeong-dong Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-787 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Yong-Jin 105-910, Buyeong Apt. Gupyeong-dong Gumi-si Gyeongbuk 730-787 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Doo-Soo 102-703 Iwon Livervill Apt. Waegwan 1-ri Waegwan-eup Chilgok-gun Gyeongbuk 718-805 / KR | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2017/07] |
Former [2011/48] | Lohmanns, Bernard Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09838929.9 | 09.12.2009 | [2017/07] | WO2009KR07333 | Priority number, date | KR20090005037 | 21.01.2009 Original published format: KR 20090005037 | [2011/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010085042 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2389693 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2389693 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/20, H01L33/02, H01L33/00, H01L33/10, H01L33/22 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H01L33/007 (EP,US);
H01L33/0075 (EP,US);
H01L33/10 (EP,US);
H01L33/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/48] | H01L33/20, H01L33/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Leuchtdioden-Bauelement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2016/33] | English: | Light emitting diode device and method for manufacturing the same | [2016/33] | French: | Dispositif de diode électroluminescente et son procédé de fabrication | [2016/33] |
Former [2011/48] | HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT, LEUCHTBAUELEMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | ||
Former [2011/48] | SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE, LIGHT EMITTING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | ||
Former [2011/48] | DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT ET LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 25.04.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/04] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 10.05.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.05.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.12.2009 | AT | 15.02.2017 | CY | 15.02.2017 | CZ | 15.02.2017 | DK | 15.02.2017 | EE | 15.02.2017 | ES | 15.02.2017 | FI | 15.02.2017 | HR | 15.02.2017 | IT | 15.02.2017 | LT | 15.02.2017 | LV | 15.02.2017 | MC | 15.02.2017 | MK | 15.02.2017 | PL | 15.02.2017 | RO | 15.02.2017 | SE | 15.02.2017 | SI | 15.02.2017 | SK | 15.02.2017 | SM | 15.02.2017 | TR | 15.02.2017 | BG | 15.05.2017 | NO | 15.05.2017 | GR | 16.05.2017 | IS | 15.06.2017 | PT | 15.06.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 09.12.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
TR | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.12.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
MK | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.12.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CY | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.12.2009 | |
AT | 15.02.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
MC | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SI | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
SM | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
DK | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
PL | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
EE | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
IT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
RO | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
SK | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
CZ | 15.02.2017 | ||
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 15.02.2017 | |
ES | 15.02.2017 | ||
FI | 15.02.2017 | ||
HR | 15.02.2017 | ||
LT | 15.02.2017 | ||
LV | 15.02.2017 | ||
SE | 15.02.2017 | ||
BG | 15.05.2017 | ||
NO | 15.05.2017 | ||
GR | 16.05.2017 | ||
PT | 15.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007166862 (KIM JONG W [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0067]; figures 2-7e *; | [A]US2007181889 (ORITA KENJI [JP]) [A] 1-22* paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0149]; figures 1A-13 *; | [A]DE102007004302 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0134]; figures 1-8C *; | [A]EP1921668 (SILTRON INC [KR]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1a-6 *; | [XAI]US2009001398 (SONG HO YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1,6-8,10,12-14,17,18 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0067]; figures 2-6E * [A] 16 [I] 2-5,9,11,15,19-22 | International search | [A]US2006223211 (MISHRA UMESH K [US], et al); | [A]KR20060121432 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]US2007166862 (KIM JONG W [KR], et al) |