EP2383116 - BACK SHEET FOR SOLAR BATTERY, AND SOLAR BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Techno Polymer Co., Ltd. 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | [2011/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WATANABE Atsushi c/o Techno Polymer Co. Ltd. 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | 02 /
HASHIMOTO Masanori c/o Techno Polymer Co. Ltd. 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 09839272.3 | 16.12.2009 | WO2009JP71000 | Priority number, date | JP20090017333 | 28.01.2009 Original published format: JP 2009017333 | [2011/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010087085 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2383116 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/18, B32B7/02, H01L31/042, B32B27/08, C08K5/00 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
C08F285/00 (EP,US);
B32B27/18 (KR);
B32B7/02 (KR);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F283/124 (EP,US);
H01L31/04 (KR);
H01L31/049 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F265/04, C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F265/04, C08F220/44 (EP,US);
C08F283/124, C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F283/124, C08F220/44 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2011/44] | B32B27/18, B32B7/02, H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | RÜCKSEITENFOLIE FÜR EINE SOLARBATTERIE SOWIE SOLARBATTERIEMODUL DAMIT | [2011/44] | English: | BACK SHEET FOR SOLAR BATTERY, AND SOLAR BATTERY MODULE COMPRISING SAME | [2011/44] | French: | FEUILLE DE DOUBLAGE POUR BATTERIE SOLAIRE, ET MODULE DE BATTERIE SOLAIRE LA COMPORTANT | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2011 | Translation filed | 08.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 14.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/32] | 21.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004255821 (MIZUGUCHI JIN [JP], et al) [A] 1,12 * paragraph [0055]; claim -; table - *; | [E]WO2010038875 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1,12 * table 13 *; | [E]EP2279863 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,12 * claims 1,15 *; | [E]EP2333842 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,12 * tables 11,13 *; | [E]EP2360738 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1,12* claim 1 * | International search | [X]JP2007128943 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [A]JP2007208179 (TEIJIN DUPONT FILMS JAPAN LTD); | [A]JP2008028294 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [XP]WO2009054450 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [YP]WO2009142191 (TECHNO POLYMER CO LTD [JP], et al) |