EP2391527 - METHODS FOR ILLUMINATION OF DRIVER AIRBAG EMBLEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv ASP, Inc. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, UT 84405 / US | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAXTON, Donald, J. 69750 Campground Road Romeo Michigan 48065 / US | 02 /
KARWACZYNSKI, Krzysztof 43638 Bockley Drive Sterling Heights Michigan 48313 / US | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Schön, Thilo, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Thilo Schön Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Schön, Thilo, et al Patentanwälte Frank Wacker Schön Schwarzwaldstrasse 1A 75173 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09839480.2 | 29.12.2009 | WO2009US69628 | Priority number, date | US20090363460 | 30.01.2009 Original published format: US 363460 | [2011/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010087931 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391527 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/215 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
B60R21/21656 (EP,US);
B60R21/215 (KR);
B60Q3/283 (EP,US);
B60Q3/64 (EP,US);
B60R13/005 (EP,US);
B60R21/20 (KR);
B60R21/203 (KR);
G09F21/04 (EP,US);
G09F9/305 (EP,US);
B60R2021/21543 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BELEUCHTUNG VON FAHRERAIRBAG-SYMBOLEN | [2011/49] | English: | METHODS FOR ILLUMINATION OF DRIVER AIRBAG EMBLEMS | [2011/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉCLAIRAGE D'EMBLÈMES DE COUSSIN DE SÉCURITÉ GONFLABLE DE CONDUCTEUR | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 09.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2147764 (CAVIS CAVETTI ISOLATI SPA) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO9640539 (WINGET LARRY J [US]) [X] 7,8 * page 6, line 6 * * page 6, line 30 - line 31 * * page 8, line 10 * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]WO0000369 (ELDRA KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 13, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-8 *; | [X]JP2000118320 (TAKATA CORP) [X] 1 * figures 1-7 *; | [X]EP1362749 (BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECH [US]) [X] 1* figures 4-9 *; | [A]WO2004024510 (JOHNSON CONTROLS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]WO2004069578 (JOHNSON CONTROLS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph 2 * * figure 6 *; | [A]US2005007752 (TSAI MING-CHIANG [TW], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 2, paragraph 19 * * figures 1-2 *; | [XY]WO2005016698 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE], et al) [X] 9-11 * page 5, line 3 * * last paragraph; page 4 * * first paragraph; page 5 * * figure 2 * [Y] 9-11; | [X]WO2005032893 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 1, line 5 - line 6 * * page 6, line 22 - line 25 * * page 10, line 11 - line 13 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1657125 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1 * figure 3 *; | [Y]US2007160334 (COBB WESTON T [US], et al) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1-2 *; | [X]EP1911630 (TRW AUTOMOTIVE SAFETY SYS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-7b * | International search | [Y]US3780281 (OHLHAUSER E, et al); | [Y]US6905788 (TYAN YUAN-SHENG [US], et al); | [Y]US7201508 (MISARAS DAVID M [US]); | [X]WO2007084031 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE], et al); | [Y]US7360932 (UKEN JOHN T [US], et al) | Examination | DE29820304U | DE102006023658 |