EP2394873 - BRAKE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIMURA, Ayako c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
OHBAYASHI, Motonari c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
NAITO, Masayuki c/o ADVICS CO. LTD. 2-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8688 / JP | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Albutt, Anthony John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 09839653.4 | 06.02.2009 | WO2009JP52043 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089876 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394873 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.08.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17, B60T7/12, B60T8/48 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T13/168 (EP,US);
B60T13/662 (EP,US);
B60T8/4045 (EP,US);
B60T8/4059 (EP,US);
B60T8/4872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | BREMSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/50] | English: | BRAKE DEVICE | [2011/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FREINAGE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2011 | Translation filed | 29.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 09.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/33] | 31.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2014526 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figures 5,6 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0027]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0029] *; | [A]EP0850815 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1,3 * column 11, line 55 - column 14, line 22; figures 1,3,4A,4B *; | [A]WO9610507 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph l - page 6, paragraph 1; figures 1,3 * | International search | [X]JP2008230514 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [X]WO2008126572 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JPH08310371 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2008296884 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]JPH10181576 (DENSO CORP) | by applicant | JPH09254762 |