EP2408662 - DRY TREE SEMI-SUBMERSIBLE PLATFORM FOR HARSH ENVIRONMENT AND ULTRA DEEPWATER APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Srinivasan, Nagan 3323 Double Lake Drive Missouri City, TX 77459 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Taylor, Adam David Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09840532.7 | 22.02.2009 | WO2009US34808 | Priority number, date | US20090378888 | 19.02.2009 Original published format: US 378888 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010096060 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408662 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/44, E02D23/02 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
B63B35/4413 (EP);
E02D23/02 (EP);
E02D27/52 (EP);
B63B2003/385 (EP);
B63B2021/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | HALB TAUCHFÄHIGE TROCKENBAUM-PLATTFORM FÜR UNWIRTLICHE UMGEBUNGEN UND TIEFSEE-ANWENDUNGEN | [2012/04] | English: | DRY TREE SEMI-SUBMERSIBLE PLATFORM FOR HARSH ENVIRONMENT AND ULTRA DEEPWATER APPLICATIONS | [2012/04] | French: | PLATE-FORME SEMI-SUBMERSIBLE AVEC TÊTE DE PRODUCTION AU SEC POUR APPLICATIONS EN ENVIRONNEMENTS DIFFICILES ET EN EAUX ULTRA-PROFONDES | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2011 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 03.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6761124 (SRINIVASAN); | [Y]US2398351 (BAKER); | [Y]US2005217554 (STEEN); | [Y]US6942427 (SRINIVASAN); | [Y]US4127004 (VILAIN); | [Y]JPS58218521 (KIMIYOSHI); | [Y]US5403124 (KOCAMAN ET AL); | [Y]US2005175414 (ABBOTT ET AL); | [Y]JPS59161521 (EIZO); | [Y]US5707178 (SRINIVASAN) |