EP2401025 - SYSTEM FOR PERCUTANEOUS ENERGY DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/01] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PERCUTANEOUS ENERGY DELIVERY | ||
[2016/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Syneron Medical Ltd. Industrial Zone Tavor Building 20692 Yoqneam / IL | [2016/39] |
Former [2012/35] | For all designated states Syneron Medical Ltd. Industrial Zone Tavor Building 20692 Yoqneam / IL | ||
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Primaeva Medical, Inc. 4160 Hacienda Drive, Suite 100 Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEHTA, Bankim, H. 3063 Sorrelwood Drive San Ramon CA 94582 / US | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2016/39] |
Former [2012/01] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09840938.6 | 14.07.2009 | [2016/39] | WO2009US50582 | Priority number, date | US20090392936 | 25.02.2009 Original published format: US 392936 | US20090398924 | 05.03.2009 Original published format: US 398924 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010098784 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401025 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401025 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/40, A61N1/05, A61N1/32 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
A61N1/04 (KR);
A61N1/05 (EP);
A61N1/18 (KR);
A61N1/328 (EP);
A61N1/403 (EP);
A61N5/06 (KR);
A61N7/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | A61N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR PERKUTANEN ABGABE VON ENERGIE | [2016/07] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PERCUTANEOUS ENERGY DELIVERY | [2016/07] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ADMINISTRATION PERCUTANÉE D'ÉNERGIE | [2016/07] |
Former [2012/01] | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR PERKUTANEN ABGABE VON ENERGIE | ||
Former [2012/01] | DEVICES AND METHODS FOR PERCUTANEOUS ENERGY DELIVERY | ||
Former [2012/01] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ D'ADMINISTRATION PERCUTANÉE D'ÉNERGIE | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 27.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 06.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2014 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.02.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 06.02.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.02.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2009 | AT | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 28.09.2016 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008091182 (MEHTA BANKIM H [US]) [X] 1,3,5,7-10,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0058] , [0059] , [0067] , [0069] , [0072] , [0073] , [0091] , [0094] , [0104] , [0105] , [0116] , [0118] , [0120] , [0121] * [I] 2,4,6,11; | [XI]US2008091183 (KNOPP PETER G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-10,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,6,11; | [XI]US2008281389 (KNOPP PETER G [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,7-10,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2,4,6,11; | [A]US2004176737 (HENLEY JULIAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002161324 (HENLEY JULIAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002156471 (STERN ROGER A [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6139545 (UTLEY DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2008127373 (PRIMAEVA MEDICAL INC [US], et al); | [Y]US2006074468 (NEEV JOSEPH [US]); | [Y]WO2006089227 (PALOMAR MEDICAL TECH INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008097558 (EGGERS PHILIP E [US], et al); | [A]US2007142885 (HANTASH BASIL M [US], et al) | by applicant | US5458596 | US6277116 | US2007081556 | US5961475 | US2008058783 | - "Ex vivo histological characterization of a novel ablative fractional resurfacing device", LASERS IN SURGERY AND MEDICINE, vol. 39, no. 2, pages 87 - 95 | US20090367448 | US20070676230 | US20070764032 | US20070832544 | US20080025924 | US20080055528 |