EP2393188 - ARMATURE FOR LINEAR MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1 Kitaotsuka 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-8451 / JP | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGITA, Satoshi c/o Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1, Kitaotsuka 1-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 1708451 / JP | 02 /
MISAWA, Yasushi c/o Sanyo Denki Co., Ltd. 15-1, Kitaotsuka 1-chome Tokyo 1708451 / JP | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2012/10] |
Former [2011/49] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfrias House The Parsonage GB-Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09841106.9 | 05.03.2009 | WO2009JP54183 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010100742 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393188 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 10.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/02, H02K41/03 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
H02K41/03 (EP,KR,US);
H02K3/24 (EP,KR,US);
H02K9/193 (KR);
H02K9/22 (KR);
H02K9/197 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ARMATUR FÜR EINEN LINEARMOTOR | [2011/49] | English: | ARMATURE FOR LINEAR MOTOR | [2011/49] | French: | INDUIT POUR MOTEUR LINÉAIRE | [2011/49] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2011 | Translation filed | 31.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 09.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1156579 (SODICK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17]; figures 1-5 * [A] 6 [I] 4; | [A]JP2002075889 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004215419 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * the whole document * * figures 4, 5 *; | [A]US2005285451 (KUBO HIROYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* paragraphs [0100] - [0106]; figures 4, 6, 7-10 *; | [AD]JP2008035698 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [AD] 1-7 * figures 7-10 * * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS5044406 (AEG ELOTHERM GMBH); | [A]JP2000227031 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JP2002075889 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | [A]JP2004215419 (NIKON CORP); | [Y]JP2005237059 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [Y]JP2006081244 (NIKON CORP); | [Y]JP2008035698 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | by applicant | JP2008035698 |