EP2406843 - BATTERY RECYCLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stevens, Wayne C. 9 Cherry Ridge Blvd. Fenwick, Ontario L0S 1C0 / CA | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09841288.5 | 03.11.2009 | [2015/34] | WO2009CA01583 | Priority number, date | US20090160058P | 13.03.2009 Original published format: US 160058 P | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010102377 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406843 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406843 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M6/52, A62D3/30, B02C23/08, B02C23/14, H01M10/54, B03B9/06 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B03B9/061 (EP,US);
H01M10/54 (EP,US);
H01M6/52 (EP,US);
B03B2009/066 (EP,US);
Y02W30/52 (EP,US);
Y02W30/84 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | H01M6/52, A62D3/30, B02C23/08, B02C23/14, H01M10/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIE-RECYCLING | [2012/03] | English: | BATTERY RECYCLING | [2012/03] | French: | RECYCLAGE DE BATTERIE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 17.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.11.2009 | AT | 19.08.2015 | BE | 19.08.2015 | BG | 19.08.2015 | CY | 19.08.2015 | CZ | 19.08.2015 | DK | 19.08.2015 | EE | 19.08.2015 | ES | 19.08.2015 | FI | 19.08.2015 | HR | 19.08.2015 | IT | 19.08.2015 | LT | 19.08.2015 | LV | 19.08.2015 | MC | 19.08.2015 | MK | 19.08.2015 | MT | 19.08.2015 | NL | 19.08.2015 | PL | 19.08.2015 | RO | 19.08.2015 | SE | 19.08.2015 | SI | 19.08.2015 | SK | 19.08.2015 | SM | 19.08.2015 | TR | 19.08.2015 | IE | 03.11.2015 | LU | 03.11.2015 | NO | 19.11.2015 | GR | 20.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | IS | 19.12.2015 | PT | 21.12.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 03.11.2009 | |
AT | 19.08.2015 | ||
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
BG | 19.08.2015 | ||
CY | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
HR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
MT | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
SM | 19.08.2015 | ||
TR | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
BE | 19.08.2015 | ||
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
IE | 03.11.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SI | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
LU | 03.11.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
MC | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
RO | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
SK | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
CZ | 19.08.2015 | ||
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
EE | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
IT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
DK | 19.08.2015 | ||
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NL | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 19.08.2015 | |
ES | 19.08.2015 | ||
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 19.08.2015 | |
FI | 19.08.2015 | ||
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
PL | 19.08.2015 | ||
SE | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
IS | 19.12.2015 | ||
PT | 21.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 19.08.2015 | |
LT | 19.08.2015 | ||
LV | 19.08.2015 | ||
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
GR | 20.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 19.08.2015 | |
NO | 19.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 19.08.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0284135 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,6-10 * claim - *; | [Y]US5252189 (CELI ANTONIO M [DE]) [Y] 2-5* column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 2; figure - *; | [XY]US5377920 (ALAVI KAMAL [CH], et al) [X] 1,6 * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 62; figure 1 * [Y] 2-5 | International search | [X]US4026477 (TREMOLADA GUSTAVO); | [A]CA2391865 (AVESTOR [CA]); | [A]CA2418527 (BATREC IND AG [CH]); | [A]US6686086 (MARTIN DOUGLAS [US], et al); | [Y]WO2009028795 (IM HYONG HAG [KR]); | [YP]US2009095127 (PATTERSON JOHN A [US]) |