23.01.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
05.11.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
10.10.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.04.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
10.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.10.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.06.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
09.04.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.04.2013 |
First examination report |
|
22.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2012 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
11.05.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
18.11.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
18.11.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] |
02.11.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|