EP2406166 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM DOOR FRAME THAT SUPPORTS GUIDE RAILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington CT 06032 / US | [2017/36] |
Former [2012/03] | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company 10 Farm Springs Farmington, CT 06032-2568 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILLER, Robin Mihekun 91 Salmon Brook Drive Glastonbury Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
ADIFON, Leandre 15 Garden Gate Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Mark Steven 151 Old Kent Road North Tolland Connecticut 06084 / US | 04 /
TERRY, Harold 73 Deepwood Drive Avon Connecticut 06001 / US | 05 /
ERICSON, Richard J. 71 Hunting Hill Dr. Southington Connecticut 06489 / US | 06 /
NICHOLS, Stephen R. 5 Burke Crossing Unionville Connecticut 06085 / US | 07 /
MARVIN, Daryl J. 15 Centerbrook Drive Farmington Connecticut 06032 / US | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Pelkovenstraße 143 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/26] | Schmitt-Nilson Schraud Waibel Wohlfrom Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/03] | Wohlfrom, Karl-Heinz Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09841626.6 | 13.03.2009 | [2018/26] | WO2009US37083 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010104514 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2406166 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2406166 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B66B13/30, B66B7/02 | [2016/23] | CPC: |
B66B13/306 (EP,CN,US);
B66B7/023 (EP,CN,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/03] | B66B13/30, B66B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSSYSTEMTÜRRAHMEN, DER FÜHRUNGSSCHIENEN STÜTZT | [2012/03] | English: | ELEVATOR SYSTEM DOOR FRAME THAT SUPPORTS GUIDE RAILS | [2012/03] | French: | DORMANT DE PORTE D'UN SYSTÈME ÉLÉVATEUR SOUTENANT DES RAILS DE GUIDAGE | [2012/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/03] | 29.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2009 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | HR | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | MK | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | NO | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | PT | 29.10.2018 | GB | 13.03.2019 | IE | 13.03.2019 | LU | 13.03.2019 | MT | 13.03.2019 | ES | 14.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 13.03.2009 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CY | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
ES | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
PT | 29.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
MT | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
GB | 13.03.2019 | ||
IE | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2019 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
HR | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
NO | 27.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3601938 (LOOMIS CHARLES M) [X] 1,3,7-11,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 19 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 2,4-6,12-14; | [XA]JPS59159676U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-3,7-11,15 * abstract * * figures 2-5 *[A] 4-6,12-14; | [XA]DE20105144U (MUELLER WOLFGANG T [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-13,15 * abstract * * page 5, lines 8-15 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 19 * * page 7, lines 8-19 * * figures 1, 4, 7, 8 * [A] 4-6,14 | International search | [A]JP2001504072 (INVENTIO AG); | [A]US2001022253 (REUTER GUNTER [DE], et al); | [A]US2002104716 (ZAHARIA VLAD [US]); | [A]US2004007429 (ANGST PHILIPP [CH], et al); | [A]US2008053756 (GREMAUD NICOLAS [CH]) |