EP2417472 - ONE PIN CALIBRATION ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensata Technologies, Inc. 529 Pleasant Street, MS B-1 Attleboro, MA 02703 / US | [2016/42] |
Former [2012/07] | For all designated states Kavlico Corporation 14501 Princeton Avenue Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORDAN, Ernest 7301 Village 7 Camarillo, CA 93012 / US | 02 /
HUNTER, Robert 121 Jordan Avenue Ventura, CA 93001 / US | 03 /
CORNWALL, Michael 14501 Princeton Avenue Moorpark, CA 93021 / US | [2012/25] |
Former [2012/07] | 01 /
CORDAN, Ernest 7301 Village 7 Camarillo CA 93012 / US | ||
02 /
HUNTER, Robert 121 Jordan Avenue Ventura CA 93001 / US | |||
03 /
CORNWALL, Michael 14501 Princeton Avenue Moorpark CA 93021 / US | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/24] | Ljungberg, Robert, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow Strathclyde G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | Konkonen, Tomi-Matti Juhani Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09841641.5 | 12.10.2009 | [2016/49] | WO2009US60390 | Priority number, date | US20090402296 | 11.03.2009 Original published format: US 402296 | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010104532 | Date: | 16.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417472 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417472 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.09.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01L27/00, G01D18/00, G01K15/00 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
G01L27/005 (EP,US);
G01D18/008 (EP,US);
G01K15/00 (EP,US);
G01K15/005 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/07] | G01R35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EIN-PIN-KALIBRATIONSBAUGRUPPE UND VERFAHREN FÜR SENSOREN | [2012/07] | English: | ONE PIN CALIBRATION ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR SENSORS | [2012/07] | French: | ENSEMBLE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTALONNAGE À UNE BROCHE POUR CAPTEURS | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 15.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2009 | AT | 07.12.2016 | BE | 07.12.2016 | CY | 07.12.2016 | CZ | 07.12.2016 | DK | 07.12.2016 | EE | 07.12.2016 | ES | 07.12.2016 | FI | 07.12.2016 | HR | 07.12.2016 | IT | 07.12.2016 | LT | 07.12.2016 | LV | 07.12.2016 | MC | 07.12.2016 | MK | 07.12.2016 | NL | 07.12.2016 | PL | 07.12.2016 | RO | 07.12.2016 | SE | 07.12.2016 | SI | 07.12.2016 | SK | 07.12.2016 | SM | 07.12.2016 | TR | 07.12.2016 | BG | 07.03.2017 | NO | 07.03.2017 | GR | 08.03.2017 | IS | 07.04.2017 | PT | 07.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 12.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
MK | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 12.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CY | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 12.10.2009 | |
AT | 07.12.2016 | ||
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
MC | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
DK | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SI | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 07.12.2016 | |
BE | 07.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.12.2016 | ||
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
IT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
PL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
SK | 07.12.2016 | ||
SM | 07.12.2016 | ||
BG | 07.03.2017 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
IS | 07.04.2017 | ||
PT | 07.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 07.12.2016 | |
EE | 07.12.2016 | ||
ES | 07.12.2016 | ||
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
RO | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
NL | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | ES | 07.12.2016 | |
FI | 07.12.2016 | ||
HR | 07.12.2016 | ||
LT | 07.12.2016 | ||
LV | 07.12.2016 | ||
SE | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.03.2017 | ||
GR | 08.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 07.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0845660 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 12 * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 49 * * figures 1,2 * [I] 1-11; | [A]US2004083834 (ENDO NOBORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] ** figure 1 * | International search | [Y]US4747048 (MUELLER JOSEPH E [US]); | [Y]US6100841 (TOTH JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US6619141 (DANNINGER DIRK SOREN [US]); | [A]US2007069734 (BERTNESS KEVIN I [US]); | [Y]US7265559 (HLADKY KAREL [GB], et al); | [A]US2008081977 (HAYTER GARY [US], et al); | [Y]EP1774270 (NCT ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2008300810 (SEESINK PETER H [NL]) |