EP2414034 - AN IMPLANTABLE MRI COMPATIBLE MEDICAL LEAD WITH A ROTATABLE CONTROL MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Jude Medical AB 175 84 Järfälla / SE | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states St. Jude Medical AB 175 84 Järfälla / SE | ||
For all designated states Olsen, Linn Stop-Ekeby 10 186 95 Vallentuna / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSLUND, Michael Fridhemsgatan 60 S-112 46 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
DJURLING, Henrik Jupitervägen 12 S-175 65 Järfälla / SE | 03 /
FORSSTRÖM, Patrik Polarisvägen 6A S-175 65 Järfälla / SE | 04 /
HENRIQUEZ, Leda Björnidegränd 175 S-162 46 Vällingby / SE | 05 /
DAHLBERG, Kenneth Kungsbrostrand 25 S-112 26 Stockholm / SE | 06 /
STEGFELDT, Olof Sävsångarvägen 64 S-138 37 Älta / SE | 07 /
SIVARD, Åke Kapellgatan 3A S-171 70 Solna / SE | 08 /
OLSEN, Linn Stolp-Ekeby 10 S-185 95 Vallentuna / SE | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/06] | 01 /
FORSLUND, Michael Fridhemsgatan 60 S-112 46 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
DJURLING, Henrik Jupitervägen 12 S-175 65 Järfälla / SE | |||
03 /
FORSSTRÖM, Patrik Polarisvägen 6A S-175 65 Järfälla / SE | |||
04 /
HENRIQUEZ, Leda Björnidegränd 175 S-162 46 Vällingby / SE | |||
05 /
DAHLBERG, Kenneth Kungsbrostrand 25 S-112 26 Stockholm / SE | |||
06 /
STEGFELDT, Olof Sävsångarvägen 64 S-138 37 Älta / SE | |||
07 /
SIVARD, Åke Kapellgatan 3A S-171 70 Solna / SE | Representative(s) | Sjölander, Henrik, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | [2014/25] |
Former [2012/33] | Sjölander, Henrik, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [2012/06] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 09842772.7 | 30.10.2009 | WO2009SE00480 | Priority number, date | WO2009SE00169 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/000169 | WO2009SE00364 | 10.07.2009 Original published format: PCT/SE2009/000364 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010114433 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414034 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2414034 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.10.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/375 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
A61N1/057 (EP,US);
A61N1/3752 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/06] | A61N1/05, A61N1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE MRT-KOMPATIBLE MEDIZINISCHE LEITUNG MIT DREHBAREM KONTROLLELEMENT | [2012/06] | English: | AN IMPLANTABLE MRI COMPATIBLE MEDICAL LEAD WITH A ROTATABLE CONTROL MEMBER | [2012/06] | French: | SONDE MÉDICALE IMPLANTABLE COMPATIBLE AVEC UNE IRM ET MUNIE D'UN ÉLÉMENT ROTATIF DE COMMANDE | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 19.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2009 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MK | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | SM | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | GB | 30.10.2014 | IE | 30.10.2014 | LU | 30.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
MT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 30.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.10.2009 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 30.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 30.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
SM | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 30.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 30.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2007299493 (OSYPKA THOMAS P [US]) [Y] 1-13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0027] - [0035] *; | [Y]US2004068299 (LASKE TIMOTHY G [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0047]; figure 4b *; | [AD]US7363090 (HALPERIN HENRY R [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002183820 (SCHELL JON [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0709111 (MEDTRONIC INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2007299493 (OSYPKA THOMAS P [US]); | [A]US2005090884 (HONECK JORDON D [US]); | [A]US6606522 (SCHELL JON [US]); | [A]US7287995 (STEIN PAUL M [US], et al); | [A]US4463765 (GOLD PHILIP [US]); | [A]US4667686 (PEERS-TRAVARTON CHARLES A [US]); | [A]US2007179577 (MARSHALL MARK T [US], et al); | [A]US2007255377 (MARSHALL MARK T [US], et al); | [A]WO2006093685 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al); | [A]US2008288040 (ECKERDAL JOHAN [SE], et al); | [A]US6295475 (MORGAN KEVIN L [US]); | [A]US5741321 (BRENNEN KENNETH R [US]) |