EP2425741 - SEPARABLE CONTENTS PLATE, AND METHOD FOR MOLDING COSMETICS USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leidex D-401 Daewoo Techno-Park 187-7 Dodang-Dong Wonmi-Gu Bucheon-City, Kyunggi-Do 420-806 / KR | For all designated states Park, Yoonsung 572-16 Noonsa-dong Gwangmyeong-si, Gyeonggi-do 423-080 / KR | For all designated states Lee, Keonchang 413-2303 Eunheangmael Ajuapt 1085-2 Kyesan-dong Kyeyang-Gu, Incheon-City 407-050 / KR | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Yoonsung 572-16 Noonsa-dong Gwangmyeong-si Gyeonggi-do 423-080 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Keonchang 413-2303 Eunheangmael Ajuapt 1085-2 Kyesan-dong Kyeyang-Gu Incheon-City 407-050 / KR | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/10] | Peckmann, Ralf Isarpatent Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09844074.6 | 20.05.2009 | WO2009KR02665 | Priority number, date | KR20090036808 | 27.04.2009 Original published format: KR 20090036808 | [2012/10] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010126192 | Date: | 04.11.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2425741 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/00, A45D33/18, A45D33/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
A45D33/00 (EP,KR,US);
A45D40/00 (EP,KR,US);
A45D33/18 (EP,KR,US);
A45D40/0068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/10] | Title | German: | TRENNBARE INHALTSPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUM FORMEN VON KOSMETIKA MITTELS DIESER PLATTE | [2012/10] | English: | SEPARABLE CONTENTS PLATE, AND METHOD FOR MOLDING COSMETICS USING SAME | [2012/10] | French: | PLAQUE DE CONTENUS SÉPARABLE, ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LE MOULAGE DE PRODUITS COSMÉTIQUES FAISANT INTERVENIR CELLE-CI | [2012/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | Translation filed | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/10] | 28.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/20] | 03.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.11.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.2012 | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR100868481B (JEONG HA IL [KR]) [A] 4-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPS62201810 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 4-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPS62201811 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 4-10 * abstract *; | [A]WO0009078 (AVON PROD INC [US]) [A] 4-10 * abstract * | International search | [A]EP0350661 (RES & DEV CO LTD [IL], et al); | [A]WO9619131 (TOLY PRODUCTS UK LIMITED [GB], et al); | [X]JP2003061742 (TOKIWA CORP); | [X]WO2006123209 (MODAPACK S R L [IT], et al) |