EP2431753 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE NUMBER OF TURNS ON A COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/12] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TESTING NUMBER OF TURNS ON COIL | ||
[2015/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jing-Jin Electric Technologies (Beijing) Co., Ltd. Building E Suite 511-A Wangjing Technology Park No.2 Li Ze Zhong Er Lu Chaoyang District, Beijing 100102 / CN | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAI, Wei Building E Suite 511-A Wangjing Technology Park No. 2 Li Ze Zhong Er Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Weimin Building E Suite 511-A Wangjing Technology Park No. 2 Li Ze Zhong Er Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Jiangtao Building E Suite 511-A Wangjing Technology Park No. 2 Li Ze Zhong Er Lu Chaoyang District Beijing 100102 / CN | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 DE-80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09844485.4 | 19.05.2009 | [2016/16] | WO2009CN00541 | Priority number, date | CN200910136688 | 13.05.2009 Original published format: CN200910136688 | [2012/12] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010130068 | Date: | 18.11.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431753 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431753 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01R29/20, G01R31/06, G01R31/34 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
G01R29/20 (EP,US);
G01R31/346 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN DER ANZAHL DER WINDUNGEN EINER SPULE | [2015/48] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TESTING THE NUMBER OF TURNS ON A COIL | [2015/48] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEST DU NOMBRE DE SPIRES D'UNE BOBINE | [2015/48] |
Former [2012/12] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM PRÜFEN DER ANZAHL DER WINDUNGEN AN EINER SPULE | ||
Former [2012/12] | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR TESTING NUMBER OF TURNS ON COIL | ||
Former [2012/12] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TEST DU NOMBRE DE SPIRES SUR UNE BOBINE | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2011 | Translation filed | 10.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 28.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.05.2009 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 19.05.2016 | LU | 19.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 19.05.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 19.05.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.05.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
LU | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.05.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005214717 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]JPH0357901 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]CH546956 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 48 - column 2, line 64; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2479699 (POWELL WILSON M) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5055757 (CAMMARATA EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 15 *; | [A]US2600088 (WARD DELBERT J) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 49; figures 1-10 * | International search | [A]US3953791 (SPURR RONALD FREDERICK, et al); | [A]GB2019015 (TINSLEY & CO LTD H); | [A]US4490671 (MORONG III WILLIAM H [US]); | [A]JPS62144081 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]CN87200470U (SHANXI PROVINCE MACHINE DESIGNING INSTITUTE); | [A]JPH08251873 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2000245119 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]CN2718596Y (SHANGHAI MAGNETIC SUSPENSION [CN]) |