EP2435157 - WASHING DEVICE FOR WATER TREATMENT APPARATUS AND WASHING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.12.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woongjin Coway Co., Ltd. 658 Yougu-ri Yougu-eup Gongjoo Choongcheongnam-do 314-895 / KR | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jung-Hwan 102-802 Hanra Apt. Jayang 3-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-193 / KR | 02 /
KA, Jin-Seong 429-166 Guro 2-dong Guro-gu Seoul 152-052 / KR | 03 /
NAM, Ho-Dong 216-202 Jugong Apt. Dunchon 1-dong Gangdong-gu Seoul 134-060 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Jong-Min 302-2406 Samsungsan Apt. Sillim 10-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-704 / KR | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/14] | Swinkels, Bart Willem Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J. W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09845294.9 | 31.12.2009 | [2020/06] | WO2009KR08011 | Priority number, date | KR20090047174 | 28.05.2009 Original published format: KR 20090047174 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010137787 | Date: | 02.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2435157 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2435157 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/16, B01D35/00, B08B9/08, // C02F1/00, C02F1/44 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
B08B9/0856 (EP,US);
B01D35/16 (KR);
B01D35/00 (KR);
B08B9/0321 (US);
C02F1/00 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US);
C02F1/44 (EP,US);
C02F2201/004 (EP,US);
C02F2201/005 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | B01D35/16, B01D35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN WASSERAUFBEREITUNGSGERÄT UND WASCHVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/14] | English: | WASHING DEVICE FOR WATER TREATMENT APPARATUS AND WASHING METHOD THEREOF | [2012/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE POUR APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'EAU ET PROCÉDÉ DE LAVAGE DE CELUI-CI | [2012/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/14] | 17.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 06.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.06.2019 | 04.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 06.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.12.2009 | AT | 05.02.2020 | CY | 05.02.2020 | CZ | 05.02.2020 | DK | 05.02.2020 | EE | 05.02.2020 | ES | 05.02.2020 | FI | 05.02.2020 | HR | 05.02.2020 | LT | 05.02.2020 | LV | 05.02.2020 | MC | 05.02.2020 | MK | 05.02.2020 | MT | 05.02.2020 | NL | 05.02.2020 | PL | 05.02.2020 | RO | 05.02.2020 | SE | 05.02.2020 | SI | 05.02.2020 | SK | 05.02.2020 | SM | 05.02.2020 | TR | 05.02.2020 | BG | 05.05.2020 | NO | 05.05.2020 | GR | 06.05.2020 | IS | 05.06.2020 | PT | 28.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.12.2009 | |
AT | 05.02.2020 | ||
CY | 05.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
MT | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
TR | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
MC | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 05.02.2020 | |
CZ | 05.02.2020 | ||
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
PL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SI | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
EE | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 05.02.2020 | |
DK | 05.02.2020 | ||
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SK | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
RO | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
SM | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 05.02.2020 | |
ES | 05.02.2020 | ||
FI | 05.02.2020 | ||
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LT | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
NL | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
IS | 05.06.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
BG | 05.05.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
GR | 06.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
HR | 05.02.2020 | ||
LV | 05.02.2020 | ||
SE | 05.02.2020 | ||
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | ||
PT | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 05.02.2020 | |
NO | 05.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9837950 (ZENON ENVIRONMENTAL INC [CA]) [X] 1-4,7-12 * page 9, line 24 - page 12, line 7; figure 1 *; | [X]DE10230738 (REBSCHER HARTMUT [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,10 * paragraphs [0011] - [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]KR100893565B (KOREA RURAL CORP [KR], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A] - "Automatically translated patent KR100893565 B1 07.06.2013 by Thomson Reuters", Automatically translated patent KR100893565 B1 07.06.2013 by Thomson Reuters, (20060417), XP055065817 [A] 1-18 * paragraphs [0029] - [0034] * | International search | [X]KR200380283Y (LEE, YONG HEE); | [A]KR950013553B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]KR970069080 (CHUNG, JOONG SUCK); | [A]US2005000243 (HWANG TAE-JIN [KR], et al); | [A]KR20080101588 (DAEWOO ENG & CONSTR CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | US2005082224 | US5310488 | JPH0263529 | CN201244531Y | WO9301431 | by applicant | WO9837950 | DE10230738 | KR100893565B | US2005082224 | JPH0263529 | US5310488 | CN201244531Y | WO9301431 | KR20060129670 |