19.05.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
23.01.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.08.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.01.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.09.2014 |
First examination report |
|
23.09.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
16.05.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.12.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
06.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
06.12.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.01.2014 [2014/02] |
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
03.08.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
23.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.03.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
09.03.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
14.02.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|