Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010139111 | Global Dossier | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN72099 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8956654 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2015 | B2 | US2012045485 | 23.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN72099 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140069381 | Global Dossier | 10.06.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN72099 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012528799 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN72099 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2437733 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2014 | A4 | EP2437733 | 11.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN72099 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0925100 | 19.07.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN72099 | 02.06.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102573811 | 11.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN72099 | 02.06.2009 |