EP2439887 - WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXING NETWORK PATH SEARCH METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2018/32] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHI, Lili ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Beier, Ralph V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | [2018/32] |
Former [2012/15] | Beier, Ralph v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte Akademiestraße 7 D-80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09845419.2 | 26.08.2009 | [2018/32] | WO2009CN73546 | Priority number, date | CN200910108024 | 05.06.2009 Original published format: CN200910108024 | [2012/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010139139 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2439887 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2439887 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04J14/02, H04L12/729 | [2018/14] | CPC: |
H04J14/0269 (EP,US);
H04B10/25 (KR);
H04B10/2581 (KR);
H04J14/0258 (EP,US);
H04J14/0267 (EP,US);
H04L12/28 (KR);
H04L45/125 (EP,US);
H04J14/0263 (EP,US);
H04J14/0271 (EP,US);
H04J14/0287 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/52] | H04J14/02, H04L12/755 | ||
Former IPC [2012/15] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SUCHE EINES PFADES IN EINEM WDM-NETZWERK | [2012/20] | English: | WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXING NETWORK PATH SEARCH METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2012/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE RECHERCHE DE CHEMIN DANS UN RÉSEAU DE MULTIPLEXAGE PAR RÉPARTITION EN LONGUEUR D'ONDE | [2012/15] |
Former [2012/15] | WAVELENGTH DIVISION MULTIPLEXING NETWORK PATH SEARCH METHOD AND SYSTEM | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2011 | Translation filed | 12.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 09.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2009 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | HR | 08.08.2018 | IT | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | IE | 26.08.2018 | LU | 26.08.2018 | MT | 26.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | FR | 08.10.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | GB | 08.11.2018 | NO | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IE | 26.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 08.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 08.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 08.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
MT | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 08.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 08.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GB | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 08.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 26.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
HR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NO | 08.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0766430 (AT & T CORP [US]) [I] 1,8 * column 3, line 42 - column 6, line 5 *; | [I]US2003020982 (RYCHLICKI VICTOR JOHN [US]) [I] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0020] - [0026] * * paragraphs [0124] - [0201] *; | [I]EP1303160 (INNOVANCE INC [US]) [I] 1,2,8,9 * paragraphs [0011] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0049] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [I] - ELIO SALVADORI ET AL, "Signalling-Based Architectures for Impairment-Aware Lightpath Set-Up in GMPLS Networks", GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, 2007. GLOBECOM '07. IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071101), ISBN 978-1-4244-1042-2, pages 2263 - 2268, XP031196360 [I] 1,2,8,9 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1983953 (ZHONGXING COMM CO LTD [CN]); | [A]JP2008054233 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]CN101145884 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [A]CN101179419 (ZTE COMM CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101192883 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |