EP2438699 - OVER-THE-AIR TEST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keysight Technologies Singapore (Holdings) Pte. Ltd. 8 Wilkie Road, 03-01 Wilkie Edge Singapore 228095 / SG | [2016/13] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Anite Telecoms OY Tutkijantie 6 90590 Oulu / FI | ||
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states Elektrobit System Test OY Tutkijantie 8 90590 Oulu / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALCK, Marko Raiskiontie 203 FI-93250 Sarajärvi / FI | 02 /
KYÖSTI, Pekka Mantankuja 14 FI-91410 Jokirinne / FI | 03 /
HEINO, Petteri Isokatu 85 A 1 FI-90120 Oulu / FI | 04 /
NUUTINEN, Jukka-Pekka Ollilantie 2 FI-90850 Martinniemi / FI | 05 /
SAASTAMOINEN, Jouni 163 London Way Coppell Texas 75019 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Hill, Justin John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | ||
Former [2012/15] | Karppinen, Olavi Arto Kolster Oy Ab P.O. Box 148 (Iso Roobertinkatu 23) 00121 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 09845461.4 | 03.06.2009 | WO2009FI50471 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010139840 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2438699 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 09.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, G01R29/08, H01Q3/24, H01Q3/26 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H04B17/0087 (EP,US);
H04B17/00 (KR);
G01R29/08 (KR);
H01Q3/24 (EP,US);
H01Q3/26 (EP,US);
H04B17/391 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/15] | Title | German: | OVER-THE-AIR-TEST | [2012/15] | English: | OVER-THE-AIR TEST | [2012/15] | French: | ESSAI EN LIAISON RADIO | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FI | 05.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 03.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/18] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - ROHDE & SCHWARZ, "Cost-Effective Over-The-Air Performance Measurements on MIMO Devices", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-091710, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090504), no. San Francisco; 20090504, XP050342455 [I] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - Michael Foegelle, "Over-the-air performance testing of wireless devices with multiple anntennas", (20060201), pages 44 - 52, URL: http://mobiledevdesign.com/hardware_news/radio_overtheair_performance_testing/, (20120831), XP055036904 [A] 1-11 * pages 44-48 * | [A] - DR CHRISTOPH VON GARGERN ED - DR CHRISTOPH VON GARGERN, "New Wireless Technologies and OTA Measurements", COST2100 4TH MCM, WROCLOW, (20080201), vol. 4th MCM TD 441, XP008155640 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US2003003883 (WALLACE RAYMOND C [US], et al); | [X]US2008056340 (FOEGELLE MICHAEL [US]); | [X]US2008305754 (FOEGELLE MICHAEL [US]); | [X] - ROHDE & SCHWARZ, "Cost-effective over-the-air performance measurements on MIMO devices", 3GPP TSG RAN WG4 (RADIO) MEETING #51, R4-091710, (20090504), pages 1 - 5, URL: http://ftp.3gpp.org/tsg_ranM/G4_Radio/TSGR4_51/Documents/, XP050342455 | Examination | - SPIRENT COMMUNICATIONS, "Practical MIMO OTA Testing", 3GPP DRAFT; R4-091362, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090330), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090330, XP050342129 | by applicant | - P6TZOLD, M., "A study of Stochastic and Deterministic Procedures for the Design of Simulation Models for Spatial Channels", PROC. 13TH IEEE LNT. SYMP. ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE PIMRC 2002, (20020915), pages 1924 - 1931, XP010611600 |