EP2441390 - DEVICE FOR EXAMINING VASCULAR FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | For all designated states Unex Corporation 2-6-1, Sakae, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-0008 / JP | [2017/09] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 3-1 Kasumigaseki 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8921 / JP | ||
For all designated states Unex Corporation 9-33 Fukue 2-chome Showa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 466-0059 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NITTA Naotaka c/o National Institute of Advanced Industrial Science and Technology 2-1, Namiki 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-8564 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA Hiroshi c/o UNEX CORPORATION 2-6-1, Sakae, Naka-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 460-0008 / JP | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/16] | Application number, filing date | 09845796.3 | 09.06.2009 | [2017/09] | WO2009JP60562 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010143271 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441390 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2441390 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06, A61B5/02, A61B5/145 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/026 (EP,US);
A61B5/02007 (EP,US);
A61B8/4483 (EP,US);
A61B8/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG DER GEFÄSSFUNKTION | [2012/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR EXAMINING VASCULAR FUNCTION | [2012/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR EXAMINER LA FONCTION VASCULAIRE | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2012 | Translation filed | 05.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 30.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2009 | AT | 01.03.2017 | CY | 01.03.2017 | CZ | 01.03.2017 | DK | 01.03.2017 | EE | 01.03.2017 | ES | 01.03.2017 | FI | 01.03.2017 | HR | 01.03.2017 | IT | 01.03.2017 | LT | 01.03.2017 | LV | 01.03.2017 | MC | 01.03.2017 | MK | 01.03.2017 | NL | 01.03.2017 | PL | 01.03.2017 | RO | 01.03.2017 | SE | 01.03.2017 | SI | 01.03.2017 | SK | 01.03.2017 | TR | 01.03.2017 | BG | 01.06.2017 | NO | 01.06.2017 | GR | 02.06.2017 | IE | 09.06.2017 | LU | 09.06.2017 | MT | 09.06.2017 | BE | 30.06.2017 | CH | 30.06.2017 | LI | 30.06.2017 | IS | 01.07.2017 | PT | 03.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 09.06.2009 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
MK | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
MT | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 09.06.2009 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CY | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
MT | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 09.06.2009 | |
AT | 01.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
MT | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
MT | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
BE | 30.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IE | 09.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
LU | 09.06.2017 | ||
CH | 30.06.2017 | ||
LI | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SI | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
MC | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
DK | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
PT | 03.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
PL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
EE | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
IT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
RO | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
SK | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
IS | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
CZ | 01.03.2017 | ||
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 01.03.2017 | |
ES | 01.03.2017 | ||
FI | 01.03.2017 | ||
HR | 01.03.2017 | ||
LT | 01.03.2017 | ||
LV | 01.03.2017 | ||
NL | 01.03.2017 | ||
SE | 01.03.2017 | ||
BG | 01.06.2017 | ||
NO | 01.06.2017 | ||
GR | 02.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2009047966 (UNEX CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * abstract *; | US2010210946 [ ] (HARADA CHIKAO [JP], et al) [ ] * paragraphs [0089] - [0102]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y] - NITTA N ET AL, "Intravascular shear stress imaging based on ultrasonic velocity vector measurement", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM, 2005 IEEE ROTTERDAM, THE NETHERLANDS 18-21 SEPT. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050918), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.2005.1602905, ISBN 978-0-7803-9382-0, pages 520 - 523, XP010899019 [Y] 1-12 * II. Shear stress testing p. 521 * * III. Experimental setup p. 521-522 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.2005.1602905 | [AP] - NAOTAKA NITTA ET AL, "Hematocrit evaluation based on ultrasonic estimations of shear rate and viscosity in blood flow", ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM (IUS), 2009 IEEE INTERNATIONAL, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090920), ISBN 978-1-4244-4389-5, pages 1349 - 1354, XP031654645 [AP] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2003144395 (FUKUDA DENSHI KK); | [A]JP2006166974 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL); | [A]JP2007175127 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A] - NAOTAKA NITTA ET AL., "Cho'onpa Ketsuryu Keisoku ni Motozuku Hemodynamic Force Imaging", Papers of Technical Meeting on Magnetics. MA Iyo.Seitai Kogaku Kenkyukai, MBE-06-116, (20061216), pages 13 - 19, XP008148412 |