EP2450303 - ELEVATOR RENEWAL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2016/11] |
Former [2012/19] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDO, Takamasa c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/11] |
Former [2012/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09846788.9 | 29.06.2009 | [2016/11] | WO2009JP61867 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011001495 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450303 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2450303 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B66B1/24, B66B19/00 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
B66B1/2458 (EP,US);
B66B7/00 (KR);
B66B1/00 (KR);
B66B19/007 (EP,US);
B66B2201/102 (EP,US);
B66B2201/103 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4973 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | B66B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFZUGSERNEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2012/19] | English: | ELEVATOR RENEWAL METHOD | [2012/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RENOUVELLEMENT D'ASCENSEUR | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2011 | Translation filed | 20.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 21.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2009 | AT | 16.03.2016 | BE | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | ES | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | IT | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | SE | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | TR | 16.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | GB | 29.06.2016 | IE | 29.06.2016 | LU | 29.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2018/32] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
TR | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
LU | 29.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.06.2009 | |
AT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/24] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
GB | 29.06.2016 | ||
IE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
BE | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
IT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 16.03.2016 | |
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
ES | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
SE | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2008149432 (FRIEDLI PAUL [CH], et al) [AD] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]JPH09278313 (OTIS ELEVATOR CO) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH02147578 (HITACHI ELEVATOR ENG & SERVICE); | [X]JP2009046284 (HITACHI BUILDING SYS CO LTD) |