EP2449422 - FULL-COLOR REFLECTIVE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2016 [2016/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITSON, Stephen Long Down Avenue Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | 02 /
GEISOW, Adrian Long Down Avenue Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | 03 /
HUNTER, Andrew Long Down Avenue Stoke Gifford Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09846939.8 | 30.06.2009 | WO2009US49267 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011002453 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2449422 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/1347, G02F1/13 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G02F1/13 (KR);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/13475 (EP,US);
G02F1/133514 (EP,US);
G02F2201/343 (EP,US);
G02F2201/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | G02F1/1335, G02F1/13 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | REFLEKTIERENDE VOLLFARBANZEIGE | [2012/19] | English: | FULL-COLOR REFLECTIVE DISPLAY | [2012/19] | French: | AFFICHAGE RÉFLÉCHISSANT EN COULEURS | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 30.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/04] | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006061530 (YUASA SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 1,6-8,10-13 * figure 4 * * and the associated text passages * | International search | [A]JPH10177167 (SHARP KK); | [A]US2003218704 (LEE HONG-SEOK [KR], et al); | [A]KR100349906B (SAMSUNG SDI CO., LTD.); | [A]KR100284163B (LG CABLE LTD.) | by applicant | US2006061530 | WO2012000008 | US5625474 | US5796447 |