EP2460087 - CONTROLLING CLOUD SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development LP 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/25] | For all designated states Hewlett Packard Enterprise Development L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALLE, Mathias Hewlett-Packard Company 1501 Page Mill Road Mail Stop 1126 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1100 / US | 02 /
EIDT, Erik L. Hewlett-Packard Company 19111 Pruneridge Ave. Cupertino, CA 95014-0691 / US | 03 /
FAIHE, Yassine Hewlett-packard France Grenoble B3 (GRE03) 2 J2 Mail Stop G05 5 ave Raymond Chanas F-38053 Grenoble / FR | 04 /
WALICKI, Jack S. Hewlett-Packard Company 19111 Pruneridge Ave. Mail Stop 4046 Cupertino, CA 95014-0691 / US | 05 /
DANIELS, Russell Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover St. Mail Stop 1032 Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/23] | Lawman, Matthew John Mitchell, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place GB-London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09847904.1 | 28.07.2009 | WO2009US51989 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011014160 | Date: | 03.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2460087 | Date: | 06.06.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 03.02.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F15/00, G06F9/06, G06F9/50, G06Q30/06 | [2013/01] | CPC: |
G06F9/5072 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0641 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/23] | G06F15/16, G06F15/00, G06F9/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/23] | Title | German: | STEUERUNG VON CLOUD-DIENSTEN | [2012/23] | English: | CONTROLLING CLOUD SERVICES | [2012/23] | French: | COMMANDE DE SERVICES INFONUAGIQUES | [2012/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 28.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 24.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03021396 (PROTIER CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 13 - line 17 * * page 8, line 8 - line 12 ** page 9, line 11 - line 14 *; | [X] - YOUSEFF L ET AL, Toward a Unified Ontology of Cloud Computing, GRID COMPUTING ENVIRONMENTS WORKSHOP, 2008. GCE '08, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PAGE(S) 1 - 10, (20081112), ISBN 978-1-4244-2860-1, XP031401158 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - LIANG-JIE ZHANG ET AL, CCOA: Cloud Computing Open Architecture, WEB SERVICES, 2009. ICWS 2009. IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PAGE(S) 607 - 616, (20090706), ISBN 978-0-7695-3709-2, XP031497868 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - BUYYA R ET AL, Market-Oriented Cloud Computing: Vision, Hype, and Reality for Delivering IT Services as Computing Utilities, HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATIONS, 2008. HPCC '08. 10TH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, PAGE(S) 5 - 13, (20080925), ISBN 978-0-7695-3352-0, XP031344187 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6802042 (RANGAN P VENKAT [US], et al); | [A]US2005114059 (CHANG CHIH-KUANG [TW], et al); | [A]US2008082490 (MACLAURIN MATTHEW B [US], et al); | [A]US2008082782 (MEIJER HENRICUS JOHANNES MARIA [US], et al) |