EP2471236 - ACCESS OF MEDIA CONTENT VIA MEDIA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagastream AB Kyrkogatan 20-22 411 15 Göteborg / SE | [2012/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SVENSSON, Martin c/o Helena Stjernström Sankt Pauligatan1, lgh 1203 SE-416 60 GÖTEBORG / SE | 02 /
KLEVERUD, Mathias Mälarbacksvägen 10 SE-790 15 SUNDBORN / SE | [2012/27] | Representative(s) | Nilsson, Lars-Magnus Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [2012/27] | Application number, filing date | 09848816.6 | 25.08.2009 | WO2009SE50949 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011025419 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2471236 | Date: | 04.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04N21/258, H04N21/2343 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
H04L67/303 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04N21/23439 (EP,US);
H04N21/25825 (EP,US);
H04N21/25833 (EP,US);
H04N21/25891 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/27] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/27] | Title | German: | ZUGANG ZU MEDIENINHALTEN ÜBER EIN MEDIENKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2012/27] | English: | ACCESS OF MEDIA CONTENT VIA MEDIA COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2012/27] | French: | ACCÈS À UN CONTENU MULTIMÉDIA PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MULTIMÉDIA | [2012/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0175612 (LEARNINGACTION INC [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * page 4, line 7 - page 7, line 18 * * figures 1-7C *; | [A]WO2006066077 (G 4 INC [US], et al) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [X]US2006242275 (SHAPIRO JODY [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10,13,14 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0189] * * figures 3A-3D, 6C *; | [X]WO2009020640 (SWARMCAST INC [US], et al) [X] 1,7,13 * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0101] * * figure 3E * | International search | [A]US2002007418 (HEGDE KIRAN VENKATESH [US], et al); | [A]US2002065925 (KENYON JEREMY A [US], et al); | [A]US6813690 (LANGO JASON [US], et al); | [A]US2007143493 (MULLIG RICHARD M [US], et al); | [A]US2008168516 (FLICK CHRISTOPHER LANCE [US], et al) |