EP2475934 - VORTEX PREMIXER FOR COMBUSTION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.04.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lean Flame, Inc. 1823 Jefferson Place NW Washington, DC 20036 / US | [2012/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENDRICK, Donald, W. 3221 165th Ave. SE Bellevue, WA 98008 / US | [2012/29] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09849341.4 | 30.11.2009 | WO2009US66117 | Priority number, date | US20090241940P | 13.09.2009 Original published format: US 241940 P | [2012/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011031279 | Date: | 17.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2475934 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/30, F23R3/28 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
F02C7/22 (EP,US);
F23R3/28 (KR);
F23C6/047 (EP,US);
F23D14/64 (EP,US);
F23R3/286 (EP,US);
F23R3/30 (KR);
F23R3/346 (EP,US);
F05D2250/10 (EP,US);
F05D2250/141 (EP,US);
F23D2900/14004 (EP,US);
F23R2900/00015 (EP,US);
Y02E20/14 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/29] | F23R3/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/29] | Title | German: | VORTEXVORMISCHER FÜR EINEN VERBRENNER | [2012/29] | English: | VORTEX PREMIXER FOR COMBUSTION APPARATUS | [2012/29] | French: | APPAREIL DE PRÉ-MÉLANGE À TOURBILLON POUR APPAREIL À COMBUSTION | [2012/29] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/29] | 15.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/22] | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US4586328 (HOWALD WERNER E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * figures 1-3, 8 * * column 1, lines 25-34 * * column 4, lines 4-6, 45-50 * * column 6, lines 51-56 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3,5,7,8 [I] 6,11-13; | [Y]EP1010945 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [Y] 7,8 * figure 1 ** paragraph [0001] *; | [XY]US2008271703 (ARMSTRONG JEFFREY P [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 5, 6 * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 57] * [Y] 3,5 | International search | [Y]US2005034458 (BURRUS DAVID LOUIS [US], et al); | [X]US2008041059 (TEETS JOSEPH MICHAEL [US]) | Examination | US5052176 |