EP2513042 - SOLID DAPOXETINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symed Labs Limited 8-3-166/6 & 7, II Floor Sree Arcade Erragadda Hyderabad 500 018 Andhra Pradesh / IN | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHAN RAO, Dodda 8-3-166 6&7 II Floor, Sree Arcade Erragadda Hyderabad 500 018 Andhrapradesh / IN | 02 /
KRISHNA REDDY, Pingili 8-3-166 6&7 II Floor, Sree Arcade Erragadda Hyderabad 500 018 Andhrapradesh / IN | 03 /
JITHENDER, Aadepu 8-3-166 6&7 II Floor, Sree Arcade Erragadda Hyderabad 500 018 Andhrapradesh / IN | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Best, Michael, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09851230.4 | 13.11.2009 | WO2009IN00640 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011058572 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2513042 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 30.08.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/48, A61K31/138, C07C213/10 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
C07C217/48 (EP,US);
C07C213/10 (US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/26] | C07C217/48, A61K31/138 | ||
Former IPC [2012/43] | C07C217/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | DAPOXETIN IN FESTER FORM | [2012/43] | English: | SOLID DAPOXETINE | [2012/43] | French: | DAPOXÉTINE SOLIDE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 06.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2014 | Observations by third parties | 17.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 13.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - LI L ET AL, "Isolation and structural elucidation of dapoxetine as an adulterant in a health supplement used for sexual performance enhancement", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 50, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.JPBA.2009.06.005, ISSN 0731-7085, (20091205), pages 724 - 728, (20090612), XP026640004 [XP] 1,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jpba.2009.06.005 | [X] - ALEXANDRE MATHIEU AND WOLFGANG ALBRECHT ET AL, "Improved resolution of (S)-dapoxetine and solid-state characterization of its hydrochloride salt", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, MASON PUBLICATIONS, HAMPSHIRE, GB, (20081101), vol. 535, no. 12, ISSN 0374-4353, page 928, XP007138541 [X] 7,12 * paragraphs [02.8] , [0003] * | [A] - TORRE O ET AL, "Lipase-catalyzed resolution of chiral 1,3-amino alcohols: application in the asymmetric synthesis of (S)-dapoxetine", TETRAHEDRON ASYMMETRY, PERGAMON PRESS LTD, OXFORD, GB, vol. 17, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.TETASY.2006.02.022, ISSN 0957-4166, (20060306), pages 860 - 866, (20060306), XP024962194 [A] 1-13 * paragraph [4.15] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetasy.2006.02.022 | International search | [A]WO2008035358 (CADILA HEALTHCARE LTD [IN], et al); | [A]CN101367739 (TAIZHOU VOCATIONAL & TECHNICAL [CN]) | [A] - SIDDIQUI, SHAFT A. ET AL., "Enantioselective synthesis of (S)-dapoxetine", TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2007), vol. 18, no. 17, doi:doi:10.1016/j.tetasy.2007.07.028, pages 2099 - 2103, XP022278206 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tetasy.2007.07.028 | Examination | WO2008035358 | by applicant | EP0288188 | US5292962 | WO2008035358 | - TETRAHYDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2006), vol. 17, pages 860 - 866 | - TETRAHYDRON: ASYMMETRY, (2007), vol. 18, pages 2099 - 2103 | - LIN LI ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL AND BIOMEDICAL ANALYSIS, (2009), vol. 50, no. 5, pages 724 - 728 | - MATHIEU ET AL., Research Disclosure, MASON PUBLICATIONS, (2008), vol. 535, page 928 |