10.07.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] |
13.03.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
09.01.2015 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.07.2014 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
04.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
04.07.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
08.04.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.11.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.11.2013 |
First examination report |
|
11.09.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.09.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.07.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
24.05.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
24.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
24.05.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
05.02.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.09.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
21.09.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
31.08.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.07.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|