21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
11.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
03.03.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
24.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
10.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] |
03.02.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] |
27.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.03.2017 [2017/09] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
25.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] |
18.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] |
11.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2016 [2016/50] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
30.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
25.03.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] |
16.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.03.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
15.03.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
14.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.11.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.04.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
26.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
26.04.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
15.02.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
08.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
14.09.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
15.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.05.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2011 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
27.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|