EP2519920 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR USER INTEREST MODELING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2018 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TIAN, Jilei RenDingHuXiLi 17-2-101 DeShengMenWai Xicheng District Beijing 100120 / CN | 02 /
HU, Rile Baoli Qiangwei Yuan 2-2-1901 No. 9 Peixin Jie Chongwen District Beijing 100062 / CN | 03 /
LI, Wenfeng Dormitory 6-134 Xitucheng Road 10 Beijing University of Posts and Communications Haidian District Beijing 100876 / CN | 04 /
WANG, Xiaojie Room 27091 Xitucheng Road 10 Haidian District Beijing 100876 / CN | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Tampereen Patenttitoimisto Oy Hermiankatu 1 B 33720 Tampere / FI | ||
Former [2012/45] | Jaatinen, Jussi Imari Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 09852747.6 | 31.12.2009 | WO2009CN76355 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079462 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519920 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.07.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/00, G06F17/30 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G06F16/313 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR MODELLIERUNG VON BENUTZERINTERESSEN | [2012/45] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR USER INTEREST MODELING | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE MODÉLISATION DE L'INTÉRÊT DES UTILISATEURS | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2012 | Search fee paid | 05.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 05.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.05.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/02] | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/02] | Appeal following examination | 30.06.2015 | Appeal received No. T2011/15 | 11.09.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.10.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008275849 (BASU SUGATO [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,7,9-15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0038] * [I] 3-6,8; | [XI] - Arindam Banerjee ET AL, "Topic Models over Text Streams: A Study of Batch and Online Unsupervised Learning", Proceedings of the SIAM International Conference on Data Mining (SDM-2007), Minneapolis, USA, (20070430), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www-users.cs.umn.edu/~banerjee/papers/07/sdm-topics.pdf, (20130710), XP055070672 [X] 1,12,13 * the whole document * [I] 2-11,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1137/1.9781611972771.40 | International search | [X]US2006218035 (PARK SANG W [KR], et al); | [A]JP2007148948 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]CN100530185C (BEIJING SOUSHEN NETWORK TECHNO [CN]); | [A]CN101520878 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) |