08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
04.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
22.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] |
01.11.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2013 [2013/49] |
20.09.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
09.08.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
26.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] |
19.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] |
07.06.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
10.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] |
03.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
19.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
12.10.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
09.10.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.10.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
10.06.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
25.03.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|