EP2343411 - Washer dryer with heat pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Miele & Cie. KG Carl-Miele-Strasse 29 33332 Gütersloh / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jording, Wolfhard Ulmenweg 16 32584 Löhne / DE | 02 /
Laforet, Marlen Hegestrasse 14 59558 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
Rösch, Jürgen Nordring 81 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE | 04 /
Strasinsky, Wolf-Dieter Lehrenkamp 8 33415 Verl / DE | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/46] | Application number, filing date | 10000066.0 | 07.01.2010 | [2011/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343411 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343411 | Date: | 14.11.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/20 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
D06F58/206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | Wäschetrockner mit Wärmepumpe | [2011/28] | English: | Washer dryer with heat pump | [2011/28] | French: | Sèche-linge doté d'une pompe à chaleur | [2011/28] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 17.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.01.2010 | CY | 14.11.2012 | CZ | 14.11.2012 | DK | 14.11.2012 | EE | 14.11.2012 | FI | 14.11.2012 | HR | 14.11.2012 | IS | 14.11.2012 | LT | 14.11.2012 | LV | 14.11.2012 | MK | 14.11.2012 | MT | 14.11.2012 | NL | 14.11.2012 | RO | 14.11.2012 | SE | 14.11.2012 | SI | 14.11.2012 | SK | 14.11.2012 | SM | 14.11.2012 | TR | 14.11.2012 | IE | 07.01.2013 | LU | 07.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | BG | 14.02.2013 | NO | 14.02.2013 | GR | 15.02.2013 | ES | 25.02.2013 | PT | 14.03.2013 | [2016/32] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 07.01.2010 | |
CY | 14.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.01.2013 | ||
LU | 07.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
TR | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
SM | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
MT | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
IE | 07.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 14.11.2012 | |
CZ | 14.11.2012 | ||
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
NL | 14.11.2012 | ||
RO | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 14.11.2012 | |
DK | 14.11.2012 | ||
EE | 14.11.2012 | ||
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
SK | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | DK | 14.11.2012 | |
FI | 14.11.2012 | ||
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
BG | 14.02.2013 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
PT | 14.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
SI | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
GR | 15.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
HR | 14.11.2012 | ||
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
LV | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 14.11.2012 | |
LT | 14.11.2012 | ||
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
ES | 25.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
SE | 14.11.2012 | ||
NO | 14.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 14.11.2012 | |
NO | 14.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1209277 (ELECTROLUX ZANUSSI ELETTRODOME [IT]) [YD] 1-3,9,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2521081 (MORRISON WILLARD L) [Y] 1-3,9,10 * column 1, line 44 - column 3, line 58; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2418239 (SMITH THOMAS R) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]CH345863 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP2065509 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0022] *; | [A]DE102007024440 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1 * column 33 - column 35 * | by applicant | EP1209277 |