EP2175452 - Data recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CY | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Motoki Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hamada, Toshiya Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2013/01] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Kato, Motoki Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Hamada, Toshiya Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Jackson, Jonathan Andrew, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/01] | Scaddan, Gareth Casey, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Scaddan, Gareth Casey, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 10000211.2 | 20.11.2001 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | JP20010065074 | 08.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001065074 | [2010/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175452 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2175452 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175452 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/034, G11B27/28, G11B27/30, G11B27/32, H04N21/235, H04N21/435 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
G11B27/28 (EP,US);
H04N21/23608 (KR);
G11B27/034 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/3036 (EP,KR,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/42646 (KR);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10537 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/15] | G11B27/28, G11B27/30, G11B27/32, G11B27/034, H04N7/24, H04N9/804 | ||
Former IPC [2010/15] | G11B27/034, G11B27/10, G11B27/28, G11B27/30, G11B27/32, H04N7/24, H04N9/804 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2010/15] | Title | German: | Datenaufzeichnungsvorrichtung | [2010/15] | English: | Data recording apparatus | [2010/15] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement de données | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 03.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01982873.0 / EP1367587 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010982873) is 25.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2014/09] |
Former [2013/52] | CY | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2000041011 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]EP1014370 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0024] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0099] ** figures 1-11 *; | [X]US6151443 (GABLE MELVIN [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - column 3, line 51 * * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 8 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US6169843 (LENIHAN MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 3, line 22 * * column 11, line 20 - column 12, line 25 * * column 13, lines 12-53 * * figure 5e *; | US6404711 [ ] (KATO MOTOKI [JP]) [ ] * the whole document * |